Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 06/25/2015 at 15:38:17 (UTC).

BOX, JERRY M vs. CELMCO INDUSTRIES

Case Summary

On 11/19/2004 BOX, JERRY M filed an Other - Complex Tort/Class Action lawsuit against CELMCO INDUSTRIES. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****9053

  • Filing Date:

    11/19/2004

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Complex Tort/Class Action

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Defendants

BOX, JERRY M

CLEMCO INDUSTRIES CORPORATION

EASTERN SAFETY EQUIPMENT CO INC

EMPIRE ABRASIVE EQUIPMENT COMPANY L P (AKA WOODFIELD GROUP INC)

HANSON AGGREGATES CENTRAL INC (FKA PIONEER SOUTH CENTRAL INC DBA

PIONEER SOUTH CENTRAL INC

PIONEER CONCRETE OF TEXAS INC

LOUIS M GERSON CO INC

OGLEBAY NORTON INDUSTRIAL SANDA INC (SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO FERRO

PALO ALTO SILICA SAND INC

PAULI & GRIFFIN COMPANY

PULMOSAN SAFETY EQUIPMENT CORPORATION

TITAN MACHINERY INC

THOMPSON'S SPECIALTIES, INC.

WOODFIELD GROUP INC

HUMBLE SAND & GRAVEL INC

IDEAL BASIC INDUSTRIES INC

INGERSOLL RAND COMPANY

LONE STAR INDUSTRIES INC

MINE SAFETY APPLIANCES CO

16 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

MARTIN, KIRK E.

LEWIS, MARK EDWYNN

WARE, JAMES L.

TAYLOR, THOMAS B.

NEWMAN, DEBORAH A.

PARKER, JERRY CLYDE

BARRON, BARBARA JANE

JARVIS, LORI ELLIOTT

WEBB, WILLIAM CURTIS

DODSON, JOE MICHAEL

PARSONS, JOHN PHILIP

Other Attorneys

WILLIAMS, W. BRUCE

RUSSELL, STEVEN L.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/20/2014
  • DISMISSED FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2014
  • NO COSTS ALLOCATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2011
  • ORDER SIGNED SUBSTITUTING ATTORNEY OF RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2010
  • TRANSFERRED TO HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2010
  • TRANSFERRED TO ANOTHER HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2010
  • ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO ANOTHER DISTRICT COURT SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2008
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2008
  • ORDER SIGNED SUBSTITUTING ATTORNEY OF RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2007
  • PARTIAL DISMISSAL ON AGREEMENT OF PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2007
  • ORDER SIGNED SUBSTITUTING ATTORNEY OF RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
51 More Docket Entries
  • 12/20/2004
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - BARRON, BARBARA JANE Person Filing - TITAN MACHINERY INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2004
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - HOLMES, PAUL JOSEPH Person Filing - CLEMCO INDUSTRIES CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2004
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - JARVIS, LORI ELLIOTT Person Filing - PARMELEE INDUSTRIES INC (AKA U S SAFETY PRODUCTS INC IN ITS OWN RIGHT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2004
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - WEBB, WILLIAM CURTIS Person Filing - 3M COMPANY (FKA MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2004
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - WEBB, WILLIAM CURTIS Person Filing - MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2004
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - WILLIAMS, W. BRUCE Person Filing - VULCAN MATERIALS COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2004
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - RUSSELL, STEVEN L. Person Filing - PENNSYLVANIA GLASS COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2004
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - RUSSELL, STEVEN L. Person Filing - U S SILICA COMPANY (FKA PENNSYLVANIA GLASS AND SAND CORPORATION)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2004
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - THACKSTON, ROBERT EDWIN Person Filing - EASTERN SAFETY EQUIPMENT CO INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2004
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - BRADLEY, LANCE P. Person Filing - BOX, JERRY M

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Humble Sand & Gravel Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where PIONEER SOUTH CENTRAL INC is a litigant