This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 04/15/2022 at 19:35:47 (UTC).

BOUTTE, TERRY (JR) vs. JACKSON OFFSHORE OPERATORS LLC

Case Summary

On 02/08/2022 BOUTTE, TERRY JR filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against JACKSON OFFSHORE OPERATORS LLC. This case was filed in Harris County District Courthouse, Harris County District Courthouse located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL GOMEZ. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****7821

  • Filing Date:

    02/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

MICHAEL GOMEZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BOUTTE, TERRY (JR)

Defendants

JACKSON OFFSHORE OPERATORS LLC

CHEVRON USA INC

RIGDON, MATTHEW

HARKNESS, JAMES

Others

JACKSON OFFSHORE OPERATORS LLC (A LOUISIANA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY)

3100 Weslayan Suite 310

Houston, TX 77027

CHEVRON USA INC (A FOREIGN CORPORATION) MAY BE SERVED BY SERVING ITS

211 E 7Th Street Suite 620

Austin, TX 78701

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHELTON, TRENTON

Defendant Attorneys

CRAWFORD, TODD GREGORY

GOLEMI, MICHAEL ANTHONY

 

Court Documents

Notice of Filing Notice of Removal

03/23/2022: Notice of Filing Notice of Removal

Exhibit A

03/23/2022: Exhibit A

Jackson Offshore Operators, LLC's Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Original Petition

03/14/2022: Jackson Offshore Operators, LLC's Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Original Petition

Defendant Chevron USA, Inc's Original Answer

03/11/2022: Defendant Chevron USA, Inc's Original Answer

Return of Service

02/22/2022: Return of Service

Return of Service

02/22/2022: Return of Service

Plaintiff's Original Petition

02/08/2022: Plaintiff's Original Petition

Request for Issuance of service

02/08/2022: Request for Issuance of service

Request for Issuance of Service

02/08/2022: Request for Issuance of Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/24/2022
  • DocketDescription: REMOVED TO FEDERAL COURT;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: CRAWFORD, TODD GREGORY; Person Filing: JACKSON OFFSHORE OPERATORS LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: GOLEMI, MICHAEL ANTHONY; Person Filing: CHEVRON USA INC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION CORPORATE; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: CHEVRON USA INC (A FOREIGN CORPORATION) MAY BE SERVED BY SERVING ITS; Issued: 2/10/2022; Served: 2/21/2022; Received: 2/22/2022; Tracking: 73970226; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: JACKSON OFFSHORE OPERATORS LLC (A LOUISIANA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY); Issued: 2/10/2022; Served: 2/21/2022; Received: 2/22/2022; Tracking: 73970215; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: SHELTON, TRENTON; Person Filing: BOUTTE, TERRY (JR);

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • DocketDescription: JURY DEMAND MADE (TRCP 216);

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • DocketDescription: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Chevron USA, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GOLEMI, MICHAEL ANTHONY

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CRAWFORD, TODD GREGORY