This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 10/26/2020 at 09:01:08 (UTC).

BOTLEY, EDGAR vs. LOWES COMPANIES INC

Case Summary

On 10/02/2020 BOTLEY, EDGAR filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against LOWES COMPANIES INC. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is KYLE CARTER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****2775

  • Filing Date:

    10/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

KYLE CARTER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BOTLEY, EDGAR

Defendant

LOWES COMPANIES INC

Other

LOWES COMPANIES INC (A CORPORATION) MAY BE SERVED BY SERVING ITS

211 E 7Th Street Suite 620

Austin, TX 78701

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MCALPINE, KIERNAN ANGUS

 

Court Documents

Citation Return

10/13/2020: Citation Return

Request for Issuance of Service

10/02/2020: Request for Issuance of Service

PLAINTIFF'S FIRST SET OF DISCOVERY TO DEFENDANT LOWES COMPANIES

10/02/2020: PLAINTIFF'S FIRST SET OF DISCOVERY TO DEFENDANT LOWES COMPANIES

PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION AND FIRST SET OF DISCOVERY

10/02/2020: PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION AND FIRST SET OF DISCOVERY

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/02/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION CORPORATE; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: LOWES COMPANIES INC (A CORPORATION) MAY BE SERVED BY SERVING ITS; Issued: 10/5/2020; Served: 10/6/2020; Received: 10/13/2020; Tracking: 73796321; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: MCALPINE, KIERNAN ANGUS; Person Filing: BOTLEY, EDGAR;

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LOWES COMPANIES, INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MCALPINE, KIERNAN ANGUS