This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 07/06/2015 at 00:45:10 (UTC).

BOSTON, RAY C vs. GEORGIA-PACIFIC CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 01/05/2005 BOSTON, RAY C filed an Other - Complex Tort/Class Action lawsuit against GEORGIA-PACIFIC CORPORATION. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1284

  • Filing Date:

    01/05/2005

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Complex Tort/Class Action

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BOSTON, RAY C

Defendants

GEORGIA-PACIFIC CORPORATION

AMETEK INC

AQUA CHEM INC

CERTAINTEED CORP

CHAMPLAIN CABLE CO

DANA CORP

FOSTER WHEELER ENERGY CORP

GARLOCK SEALING TECHNOLOGIES LLC

GENERAL REFRACTORIES CO

GEORGIA PACIFIC CORP

KELLY-MOORE

METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE CO

OWENS ILLINOIS INC

RILEY POWER INC

UNION CARBIDE CORP

ZURN INDUSTRIES INC

RAPID AMERICAN CORP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JACKSON, D. LEANNE

Defendant Attorneys

ELLISTON, GARY D.

WHITE, CLAY M.

TAYLOR, CLINT LEWIS

BAILEY, MELVIN DAVID

WADE, TODD N.

MOIR, PETER A.

BLIZZARD, JOSEPH

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/05/2015
  • NO COSTS ALLOCATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2015
  • ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED BY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2013
  • PARTIAL REMOVAL TO BANKRUPTCY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2005
  • ANSWER ALL CROSS ACTION : Filing Attorney - WHITE, CLAY M. Person Filing - AQUA CHEM INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - WHITE, CLAY M. Person Filing - AQUA CHEM INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - BAILEY, MELVIN DAVID Person Filing - KELLY-MOORE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2005
  • ANSWER CROSS ACTION : Filing Attorney - RHODES, KENNETH D. Person Filing - OWENS ILLINOIS INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2005
  • ANSWER CROSS ACTION : Filing Attorney - TAYLOR, CLINT LEWIS Person Filing - GENERAL REFRACTORIES CO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - MOIR, PETER A. Person Filing - OWENS ILLINOIS INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - TAYLOR, CLINT LEWIS Person Filing - GENERAL REFRACTORIES CO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - WADE, TODD N. Person Filing - METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE CO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - BLIZZARD, JOSEPH Person Filing - RAPID AMERICAN CORP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - CALDERON, RAUL M. Person Filing - AMETEK INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - ELLISTON, GARY D. Person Filing - UNION CARBIDE CORP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - ELLISTON, GARY D. Person Filing - DANA CORP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - ELLISTON, GARY D. Person Filing - UNION CARBIDE CORP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - ELLISTON, GARY D. Person Filing - CERTAINTEED CORP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - CALDERON, RAUL M. Person Filing - CHAMPLAIN CABLE CO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2005
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - JACKSON, D. LEANNE Person Filing - BOSTON, RAY C

    Read MoreRead Less