This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 06/24/2015 at 11:23:14 (UTC).

BOONE, MARTIN MARCEL vs. A W CHESTERTON CO

Case Summary

On 08/30/2004 BOONE, MARTIN MARCEL filed an Other - Complex Tort/Class Action lawsuit against A W CHESTERTON CO. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****3741

  • Filing Date:

    08/30/2004

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Complex Tort/Class Action

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Defendants

BOONE, MARTIN MARCEL

BOONE, LILIA CUERPO

SMITH, WILLIE LEE

SMITH, MARY

AMERICAN STANDARD INC

CROWN CORK AND SEAL COMPANY INC

GEORGIA-PACIFIC CORPORATION

KELLY-MOORE PAINT COMPANY INC

METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY

WARREN PUMPS INC

YEOMANS CHICAGO CORPORATION

DEBERRY, CLYDE BENJAMIN

A W CHESTERTON CO

AQUA-CHEM INC (D/B/A CLEAVER-BROOKS DIVISION)

CLEAVER-BROOKS DIVISION

BABCOCK BORSIG POWER INC (F/K/A D B RILEY INC (F/K/A RILEY STOKER

D B RILEY INC

RILEY STOKER CORPORATION

BUFFALO PUMPS INC

CERTAINTEED CORPORATION

66 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

WATHEN, FRANK J. II

SMITH, J. MARK

OLD, JAMES ROWLAND JR.

STUART, KIMBERLY ROSE

BAILEY, MELVIN DAVID

WADE, TODD N.

RHODES, KENNETH D.

THACKSTON, ROBERT EDWIN

HUEBER, SUSAN JAN

WHITE, CLAY M.

POWERS, JAMES H.

Other Attorneys

LOWERY, JAMES A. III

LYNN, LAWRENCE A.

FOLEY, KEITH WILLIAM

WARE, JAMES L.

PRAZAK, JONATHAN R

FRASE, LAURA ANN

ELLISTON, GARY D.

IRVIN, JASON JAMES

HUNTER, HAROLD HARVEY

23 More Attorneys Available

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/02/2014
  • PARTIES ADMIN CLOSED BY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2013
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2011
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2010
  • ANSWER SECOND AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - LEDYARD, DAVID W. Person Filing - OCCIDENTAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2010
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - LANGE, SIDNEY TODD Person Filing - HENRY VOGT MACHINE CO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2010
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2009
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2008
  • ORDER FOR INTERLOCUTORY SUMMARY JUDGMENT SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2008
  • ORDER SIGNED SUBSTITUTING ATTORNEY OF RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2008
  • ORDER SIGNED SUBSTITUTING ATTORNEY OF RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
112 More Docket Entries
  • 11/10/2004
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - LOFTIN, STEPHEN MCBRIDE Person Filing - T H AGRICULTURE & NUTRITION L L C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2004
  • ANSWER : Filing Attorney - COLE, RYAN GRANT Person Filing - IMO INDUSTRIES INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2004
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - JORDAN, JOHN MICHAEL Person Filing - IMO INDUSTRIES INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2004
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - POWELL, LISA A. Person Filing - ABLE SUPPLY COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2004
  • ANSWER ALL CROSS ACTION : Filing Attorney - POWELL, LISA A. Person Filing - ABLE SUPPLY COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2004
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - SMITH, J. MARK Person Filing - SMITH, MARY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2004
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - SMITH, J. MARK Person Filing - DEBERRY, CLYDE BENAJMIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2004
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - SMITH, J. MARK Person Filing - SMITH, WILLIE LEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2004
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - SMITH, J. MARK Person Filing - BOONE, MARTIN MARCEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2004
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - SMITH, J. MARK Person Filing - BOONE, LILIA CUERPO

    Read MoreRead Less