This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 07/06/2015 at 00:03:21 (UTC).

BOONE, GEORGINE vs. BOONE, JOHN T

Case Summary

On 01/05/2005 BOONE, GEORGINE filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against BOONE, JOHN T. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0273

  • Filing Date:

    01/05/2005

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Defendants

BOONE, GEORGINE

BOONE, JON T

BOONE, JOHN T

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

DICKSON, SARAH SMITH

GUTIERRES, SAMUEL

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/19/2005
  • EACH PAY OWN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2005
  • AGREED JUDGMENT, ORDER SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2005
  • HOLD FOR JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2005
  • COUNTER CLAIM : Filing Attorney - GUTIERRES, SAMUEL Person Filing - BOONE, JON T

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - GUTIERRES, SAMUEL Person Filing - BOONE, JON T

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2005
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - DICKSON, SARAH SMITH Person Filing - BOONE, GEORGINE

    Read MoreRead Less