This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 06/24/2015 at 11:40:30 (UTC).

BOGLE, DARLENE vs. KROGER #372

Case Summary

On 08/30/2004 BOGLE, DARLENE filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against KROGER 372. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****7377

  • Filing Date:

    08/30/2004

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BOGLE, DARLENE

Defendants

KROGER #372

KROGER CO

KROGER TEXAS L P

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CRIACO, ADAM P.

Defendant Attorney

AKERS, BROCK C.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/04/2005
  • EACH PAY OWN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2005
  • ORDER OF NON-SUIT SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2005
  • HOLD FOR JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2005
  • SECOND AMENDED ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - AKERS, BROCK C. Person Filing - KROGER CO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2005
  • SECOND AMENDED ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - AKERS, BROCK C. Person Filing - KROGER #372

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2005
  • SECOND SUPPLEMENTAL ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - AKERS, BROCK C. Person Filing - KROGER TEXAS L P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2005
  • SECOND SUPPLEMENTAL ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - AKERS, BROCK C. Person Filing - KROGER CO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2005
  • SECOND AMENDED ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - AKERS, BROCK C. Person Filing - KROGER TEXAS L P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2005
  • SECOND SUPPLEMENTAL ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - AKERS, BROCK C. Person Filing - KROGER #372

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2005
  • THIRD AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - CRIACO, ADAM P. Person Filing - BOGLE, DARLENE

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 10/28/2004
  • SUPPLEMENTAL ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - DEMPSEY, KELLY ANN Person Filing - KROGER #372

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2004
  • DESIGNATED TRIAL READY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2004
  • FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - CRIACO, ADAM P. Person Filing - BOGLE, DARLENE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2004
  • FIRST AMENDED ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - AKERS, BROCK C. Person Filing - KROGER CO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2004
  • FIRST AMENDED ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - AKERS, BROCK C. Person Filing - KROGER #372

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2004
  • JURY DEMAND MADE (TRCP 216)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2004
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - AKERS, BROCK C. Person Filing - KROGER CO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2004
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - AKERS, BROCK C. Person Filing - KROGER #372

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2004
  • JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2004
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - CRIACO, ADAM P. Person Filing - BOGLE, DARLENE

    Read MoreRead Less