This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 07/06/2015 at 00:42:16 (UTC).

BMW PARTNERS L L C vs. MCCLOSKEY & HERBERGER P C

Case Summary

On 01/05/2005 BMW PARTNERS L L C filed an Other lawsuit against MCCLOSKEY HERBERGER P C. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1209

  • Filing Date:

    01/05/2005

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Defendants

BMW PARTNERS L L C

WILLIAMS, BRIAN

TYSON & ASSOCIATES L L C

WILLIAMS, SHAUN

MARVIN L RADER & ASSOCIATES

RADER, MARVIN L

MCCLOSKEY & HERBERGER P C

MCCLOSKEY, TIM

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

LUBIN, DAVID A.

FUHR, FREDERICK LEE

MEYER, JOE WILLIAM II

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/24/2005
  • NO COSTS ALLOCATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2005
  • DISMISSED ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2005
  • HOLD FOR JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2005
  • DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2005
  • ORDER FOR INTERLOCUTORY SUMMARY JUDGMENT SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2005
  • MOTION FOR SEVERANCE GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2005
  • SECOND AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - GLENN, D. WOODARD Person Filing - WILLIAMS, SHAUN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2005
  • SECOND AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - GLENN, D. WOODARD Person Filing - TYSON & ASSOCIATES L L C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2005
  • SECOND AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - GLENN, D. WOODARD Person Filing - WILLIAMS, BRIAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2005
  • SECOND AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - GLENN, D. WOODARD Person Filing - BMW PARTNERS L L C

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 03/28/2005
  • ANSWER FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - FUHR, FREDERICK LEE Person Filing - RADER, MARVIN L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2005
  • COUNTER CLAIM : Filing Attorney - FUHR, FREDERICK LEE Person Filing - MARVIN L RADER & ASSOCIATES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2005
  • FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - LUBIN, DAVID A. Person Filing - WILLIAMS, BRIAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2005
  • FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - LUBIN, DAVID A. Person Filing - WILLIAMS, SHAUN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2005
  • FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - LUBIN, DAVID A. Person Filing - TYSON & ASSOCIATES L L C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2005
  • FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - LUBIN, DAVID A. Person Filing - BMW PARTNERS L L C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2005
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - LUBIN, DAVID A. Person Filing - BMW PARTNERS L L C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2005
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - LUBIN, DAVID A. Person Filing - TYSON & ASSOCIATES L L C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2005
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - LUBIN, DAVID A. Person Filing - WILLIAMS, SHAUN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2005
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - LUBIN, DAVID A. Person Filing - WILLIAMS, BRIAN

    Read MoreRead Less