This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 06/19/2020 at 07:18:11 (UTC).

BLANK, MIRIAM GUTMAN vs. HARRIS COUNTY CONSTABLE, PRECINCT 7

Case Summary

On 05/26/2020 BLANK, MIRIAM GUTMAN filed an Other - Expungement lawsuit against HARRIS COUNTY CONSTABLE, PRECINCT 7. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is RABEEA COLLIER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1376

  • Filing Date:

    05/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Expungement

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

RABEEA COLLIER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BLANK, MIRIAM GUTMAN

Houston, TX 77092

Defendants

HOUSTON CRIMINAL COURTS

Houston, TX 77002

HARRIS COUNTY UNIVERSAL SERVICES

406 Caroline Street,

Houston, TX 77002

TEXAS MEDICAL BOARD

P.O. Box 2029,

Houston, TX 78768

HARRIS COUNTY CLERK'S OFFICE

HARRIS COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE

1200 Baker Street,

Houston, TX 77002

OFFICE OF COURT ADMINISTRATION

205 W. 14Th Street,

Austin, TX 78701

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY

HARRIS COUNTY PRETRIAL SERVICES

HARRIS COUNTY CONSTABLE, PRECINCT 7

5290 Griggs Road

Houston, TX 77021

TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF CRIMINAL JUSTICE - OFFICE OF THE GENERAL COUNSEL

TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY - CRIME RECORDS SERVICE (MSC0234)

TEXAS ACADEMY OF PHYSICIAN ASSISTANTS

401 W. 15Th Street,

Austin, TX 78701

HARRIS COUNTY TREASURER

1001 Preston,

Houston, TX 77002

Others

HARRIS COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE BY SERVING MAJOR MAC MCKELVY

1200 Baker Street

Houston, TX 77011

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE BY SERVING SCOTT A DURFEE

1310 Prairie 5Th Floor

Houston, TX 77002

ALL CRIMINAL COURTS BY SERVING RANDALL SMIDT

1310 Prairie Ste 880

Houston, TX 77002

HARRIS COUNTY PRETRIAL SERVICES BY SERVING KELVIN L BANKS DIRECTOR

102 San Jacinto

Houston, TX 77002

HARRIS COUNTY CLERK BY SERVING RANDALL SMIDT

1310 Prairie Ste 880

Houston, TX 77002

TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY BY SERVING EXPUNCTION UNIT

Po Box 4143

Austin, TX 78765

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/18/2020
  • HearingCourt: 113; Docket Type: Law Day Docket; Reason: SHOW CAUSE MOTION FOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: TEXAS ACADEMY OF PHYSICIAN ASSISTANTS; Issued: 6/3/2020; Tracking: 73755038; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: TEXAS MEDICAL BOARD; Issued: 6/3/2020; Tracking: 73755037; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY CONSTABLE, PRECINCT 7; Issued: 6/3/2020; Tracking: 73755036; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY UNIVERSAL SERVICES; Issued: 6/3/2020; Tracking: 73755035; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY TREASURER; Issued: 6/3/2020; Tracking: 73755034; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HOUSTON CRIMINAL COURTS; Issued: 6/3/2020; Tracking: 73755032; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ASSIGNED TO CLERK/NOT ISSUED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HOUSTON CRIMINAL COURTS; Tracking: 73755031; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ASSIGNED TO CLERK/NOT ISSUED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE; Tracking: 73755030; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: OFFICE OF COURT ADMINISTRATION; Issued: 6/3/2020; Tracking: 73755029; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY PRETRIAL SERVICES BY SERVING KELVIN L BANKS DIRECTOR; Issued: 6/3/2020; Tracking: 73754490; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY CLERK BY SERVING RANDALL SMIDT; Issued: 6/3/2020; Tracking: 73754489; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE BY SERVING SCOTT A DURFEE; Issued: 6/3/2020; Tracking: 73754488; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: ALL CRIMINAL COURTS BY SERVING RANDALL SMIDT; Issued: 6/3/2020; Tracking: 73754487; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE BY SERVING MAJOR MAC MCKELVY; Issued: 6/3/2020; Tracking: 73754486; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY BY SERVING EXPUNCTION UNIT; Issued: 6/3/2020; Tracking: 73754485; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORDER SIGNED SETTING HEARING; Order Signed: 5/27/2020;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • DocketDescription: SENSITIVE DATA INCLUDED IN DOCUMENT; Order Signed: 5/27/2020;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person Filing: BLANK, MIRIAM GUTMAN;

    Read MoreRead Less