This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 07/30/2020 at 07:35:18 (UTC).

BISHOP, LINDA F vs. MITS INC

Case Summary

On 07/06/2020 BISHOP, LINDA F filed an Other lawsuit against MITS INC. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is KYLE CARTER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****9678

  • Filing Date:

    07/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

KYLE CARTER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BISHOP, LINDA F

Defendants

PIG ENTERPRISES INC

MITS INC

Others

PIG ENTERPRISES INC (TEXAS LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY)

1907 Mangum Rd

Houston, TX 77092

MITS INC (TEXAS CORPORATION)

1907 Mangum Rd Roya

Houston, TX 77092

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NEVILLE, T. MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SERVICE

07/06/2020: REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SERVICE

PLAINTIFFS ORIGINAL PETITION

07/06/2020: PLAINTIFFS ORIGINAL PETITION

Citation Corporate

07/09/2020: Citation Corporate

Citation

07/09/2020: Citation

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: PIG ENTERPRISES INC (TEXAS LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY); Issued: 7/7/2020; Served: 7/9/2020; Tracking: 73764629; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION CORPORATE; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: MITS INC (TEXAS CORPORATION); Issued: 7/7/2020; Served: 7/9/2020; Tracking: 73764619; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: NEVILLE, T. MICHAEL; Person Filing: BISHOP, LINDA F;

    Read MoreRead Less