This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 10/16/2020 at 07:56:19 (UTC).

BICO DRILLING TOOLS INC vs. TRUE PERFORMANCE DIRECTIONAL DRILLING LLC

Case Summary

On 09/22/2020 BICO DRILLING TOOLS INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against TRUE PERFORMANCE DIRECTIONAL DRILLING LLC. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is DONNA ROTH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****9001

  • Filing Date:

    09/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

DONNA ROTH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BICO DRILLING TOOLS INC

Defendant

TRUE PERFORMANCE DIRECTIONAL DRILLING LLC

Other

TRUE PERFORMANCE DIRECTIONAL DRILLING LLC (A TEXAS CORPORATION)

5900 Balcones Drive Suite 100

Austin, TX 78731

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GRISSETT, FARLEY D.

 

Court Documents

Certified Mail Receipt

09/23/2020: Certified Mail Receipt

Domestic Return Receipt

09/30/2020: Domestic Return Receipt

Exhibit A

09/22/2020: Exhibit A

Exhibit A

09/22/2020: Exhibit A

EXHIBIT A

09/22/2020: EXHIBIT A

PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE

09/22/2020: PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE

Certified Mail 7019 0140 0000 5910 2377

09/23/2020: Certified Mail 7019 0140 0000 5910 2377

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (CERTIFIED); Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: TRUE PERFORMANCE DIRECTIONAL DRILLING LLC (A TEXAS CORPORATION); Issued: 9/23/2020; Tracking: 73791066; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: GRISSETT, FARLEY D.; Person Filing: BICO DRILLING TOOLS INC;

    Read MoreRead Less