This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 10/16/2020 at 07:54:07 (UTC).

BICO DRILLING TOOLS INC vs. FUSSELMAN RESOURCES LLC

Case Summary

On 09/22/2020 BICO DRILLING TOOLS INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against FUSSELMAN RESOURCES LLC. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is CHRISTINE WEEMS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****8990

  • Filing Date:

    09/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

CHRISTINE WEEMS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BICO DRILLING TOOLS INC

Defendant

FUSSELMAN RESOURCES LLC

Other

FUSSELMAN RESOURCES LLC MAY BE SERVED BY SERVING ITS REGISTERED

5900 Balcones Drive Ste 100

Austin, TX 78731

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other and Plaintiff Attorney

GRISSETT, FARLEY D.

 

Court Documents

Certified Mail Tracking Number 7016 0600 0001 0963 6777

09/23/2020: Certified Mail Tracking Number 7016 0600 0001 0963 6777

Certified Mail Receipt

09/25/2020: Certified Mail Receipt

Domestic Return Receipt

10/06/2020: Domestic Return Receipt

EXHIBIT A(9)

09/22/2020: EXHIBIT A(9)

EXHIBIT A(8)

09/22/2020: EXHIBIT A(8)

EXHIBIT A(7)

09/22/2020: EXHIBIT A(7)

EXHIBIT A(6)

09/22/2020: EXHIBIT A(6)

EXHIBIT A(5)

09/22/2020: EXHIBIT A(5)

EXHIBIT A(4)

09/22/2020: EXHIBIT A(4)

EXHIBIT A(3)

09/22/2020: EXHIBIT A(3)

EXHIBIT A(1)

09/22/2020: EXHIBIT A(1)

EXHIBIT A AFFIDAVIT OF JAY CHATHA

09/22/2020: EXHIBIT A AFFIDAVIT OF JAY CHATHA

EXHIBIT A (2)

09/22/2020: EXHIBIT A (2)

EXHIBIT A

09/22/2020: EXHIBIT A

PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE

09/22/2020: PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (CERTIFIED); Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: FUSSELMAN RESOURCES LLC MAY BE SERVED BY SERVING ITS REGISTERED; Issued: 9/23/2020; Served: 9/28/2020; Tracking: 73791159; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: GRISSETT, FARLEY D.; Person Filing: BICO DRILLING TOOLS INC;

    Read MoreRead Less