This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 10/16/2020 at 08:03:52 (UTC).

BICO DRILLING TOOLS INC vs. COBALT PERMIAN LLC

Case Summary

On 09/22/2020 BICO DRILLING TOOLS INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against COBALT PERMIAN LLC. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is ROBERT K. SCHAFFER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****9041

  • Filing Date:

    09/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

ROBERT K. SCHAFFER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BICO DRILLING TOOLS INC

Defendant

COBALT PERMIAN LLC

Other

COBALT PERMIAN LLC MAY BE SERVED BY SERVING ITS REGISTERED AGENT

10601 Clarence Drive Suite 250

Frisco, TX 75033

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GRISSETT, FARLEY D.

 

Court Documents

Certified Mail Receipt

09/24/2020: Certified Mail Receipt

Domestic Return Receipt

10/06/2020: Domestic Return Receipt

Exhibit A(3)

09/22/2020: Exhibit A(3)

Exhibit A(2)

09/22/2020: Exhibit A(2)

Exhibit A(1)

09/22/2020: Exhibit A(1)

Exhibit A

09/22/2020: Exhibit A

Exhibit A

09/22/2020: Exhibit A

Plaintiff's original petition and reqeust for disclosure

09/22/2020: Plaintiff's original petition and reqeust for disclosure

Certified Mail Tracking Number 7019 2280 0000 0782 6035

09/23/2020: Certified Mail Tracking Number 7019 2280 0000 0782 6035

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (CERTIFIED); Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: COBALT PERMIAN LLC MAY BE SERVED BY SERVING ITS REGISTERED AGENT; Issued: 9/23/2020; Served: 9/28/2020; Tracking: 73791716; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: GRISSETT, FARLEY D.; Person Filing: BICO DRILLING TOOLS INC;

    Read MoreRead Less