This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 10/16/2020 at 07:30:46 (UTC).

BICO DRILLING TOOLS INC vs. BLACK VALLEY DIRECTIONAL DRILLING LLC

Case Summary

On 09/22/2020 BICO DRILLING TOOLS INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against BLACK VALLEY DIRECTIONAL DRILLING LLC. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is TANYA GARRISON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****8874

  • Filing Date:

    09/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

TANYA GARRISON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BICO DRILLING TOOLS INC

Defendant

BLACK VALLEY DIRECTIONAL DRILLING LLC

Other

BLACK VALLEY DIRECTIONAL DRILLING LLC (A FOREIGN LIMITED LIABILITY

9900 Spectrum Dr

Austin, TX 78717

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GRISSETT, FARLEY D.

 

Court Documents

Certified Mail Receipt

09/23/2020: Certified Mail Receipt

Domestic Return Receipt

09/29/2020: Domestic Return Receipt

EXHIBIT A (3)

09/22/2020: EXHIBIT A (3)

EXHIBIT A (2)

09/22/2020: EXHIBIT A (2)

EXHIBIT A (1)

09/22/2020: EXHIBIT A (1)

Exhibit A

09/22/2020: Exhibit A

Exhibit A

09/22/2020: Exhibit A

PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE

09/22/2020: PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE

Certified Mail 7019 0140 0000 5910 2384

09/23/2020: Certified Mail 7019 0140 0000 5910 2384

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (CERTIFIED); Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: BLACK VALLEY DIRECTIONAL DRILLING LLC (A FOREIGN LIMITED LIABILITY; Issued: 9/23/2020; Served: 9/25/2020; Tracking: 73791140; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: GRISSETT, FARLEY D.; Person Filing: BICO DRILLING TOOLS INC;

    Read MoreRead Less