This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 10/16/2020 at 07:18:41 (UTC).

BICO DRILLING TOOLS INC vs. BEAST ENERGY SERVICES INC

Case Summary

On 09/22/2020 BICO DRILLING TOOLS INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against BEAST ENERGY SERVICES INC. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is CORY SEPOLIO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****8809

  • Filing Date:

    09/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

CORY SEPOLIO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BICO DRILLING TOOLS INC

Defendant

BEAST ENERGY SERVICES INC

Other

BEAST ENERGY SERVICES INC (A TEXAS CORPORATION) MAY BE SERVED WITH

7650 A Country Road

Rosharon, TX 77539

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GRISSETT, FARLEY D.

 

Court Documents

Certified Mail Tracking Number 7017 1450 0001 3705 8223

09/24/2020: Certified Mail Tracking Number 7017 1450 0001 3705 8223

Certified Mail Receipt

09/29/2020: Certified Mail Receipt

Exhibit A(6)

09/22/2020: Exhibit A(6)

Exhibit A(5)

09/22/2020: Exhibit A(5)

Exhibit A(4)

09/22/2020: Exhibit A(4)

Exhibit A(3)

09/22/2020: Exhibit A(3)

Exhibit A(2)

09/22/2020: Exhibit A(2)

Exhibit A(1)

09/22/2020: Exhibit A(1)

Exhibit A

09/22/2020: Exhibit A

Exhibit A

09/22/2020: Exhibit A

Plaintiff's Original Petition and Request for Disclosure

09/22/2020: Plaintiff's Original Petition and Request for Disclosure

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (CERTIFIED); Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: BEAST ENERGY SERVICES INC (A TEXAS CORPORATION) MAY BE SERVED WITH; Issued: 9/24/2020; Tracking: 73792371; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: GRISSETT, FARLEY D.; Person Filing: BICO DRILLING TOOLS INC;

    Read MoreRead Less