This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 12/14/2022 at 18:31:17 (UTC).

BHANGAR, SHAHEER vs. LIVE NATION ENTERTAINMENT INC

Case Summary

On 11/04/2022 BHANGAR, SHAHEER filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against LIVE NATION ENTERTAINMENT INC. This case was filed in Harris County District Courthouse, Harris County District Courthouse located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is KRISTEN BRAUCHLE HAWKINS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****3189

  • Filing Date:

    11/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

KRISTEN BRAUCHLE HAWKINS

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BHANGAR, SHAHEER

BROWN, ELISE

CLARK, ARIELE

COAKLEY, CANAAN

CONE, CARSON

DURAN, BRYAN

EVERIDGE, JUSTIN

FAZENBAKER, JOCELYN

FENLEY, KRIS JR

FLOWERS, ANTARIO

FORRIS, JERMEY

FRANCOIS, FRANCESCA

FRAZIER, KALEB

GARCIA, GERARDO

GOUDEAU, CARL

GREEN, ERROLL

HALL, LESLIE

HARRIS, JAQUAN

HERNANDEZ, KEVIN

Defendant

LIVE NATION ENTERTAINMENT INC

119 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HAYNES, KEVIN CLYDE

Defendant Attorney

MANNE, NEAL S.

Other Attorneys

REYNOLDS, CHARLES TIMOTHY

NICHOLS, ERIC

BRINSON, PHILIP ROBERT

RYAN, ELIZABETH YVONNE

YETTER, R. PAUL

ESPEY, RICHARD

MILHOLLIN, KAREN KLAAS

MOYE, WILLIAM RICHARDS

 

Court Documents

Defendant Tri Star Sports & Entertainment Group, Inc.s Verified Special Appearance To Contest Personal Jurisdiction And Subject To Special AppearanceOriginal Answer, Affirmative Defenses, And Special Exceptions

12/13/2022: Defendant Tri Star Sports & Entertainment Group, Inc.s Verified Special Appearance To Contest Personal Jurisdiction And Subject To Special AppearanceOriginal Answer, Affirmative Defenses, And Special Exceptions

Declaration Of Louise M. Taylor In Support Of Tri Stars Special Appearance To Contest Personal Jurisdiction AndSubject To Special AppearanceOriginal Answer And Affirmative Defenses

12/13/2022: Declaration Of Louise M. Taylor In Support Of Tri Stars Special Appearance To Contest Personal Jurisdiction AndSubject To Special AppearanceOriginal Answer And Affirmative Defenses

James Lowery Hicks' Original Answer, Special Exceptions and RTP

12/12/2022: James Lowery Hicks' Original Answer, Special Exceptions and RTP

Defendant Apple Inc's Original Answer

12/12/2022: Defendant Apple Inc's Original Answer

Defendant BWG Inc's Original Answer and Jury Demand in Response to Plaintiffs' Original Petition

12/12/2022: Defendant BWG Inc's Original Answer and Jury Demand in Response to Plaintiffs' Original Petition

Defendant Scoremore LLC's Original Answer

12/09/2022: Defendant Scoremore LLC's Original Answer

Defendant Sascha Stone Guttfreund's Original Answer

12/09/2022: Defendant Sascha Stone Guttfreund's Original Answer

Defendant Scoremore MGMT LLC's Original Answer

12/09/2022: Defendant Scoremore MGMT LLC's Original Answer

Defendant Fuse Technical Original Answer and Jury Demand

12/09/2022: Defendant Fuse Technical Original Answer and Jury Demand

Citation-Aubrey Graham

12/08/2022: Citation-Aubrey Graham

Return of service-Valle Security Texas LLC

12/08/2022: Return of service-Valle Security Texas LLC

Return of service

12/06/2022: Return of service

Original Answer Of Defendants Jacques Bermon Webster Ii A/K/A Travis Scott A/K/A Cactus Jack, Xx Global, Inc., Cactus Jack Records, Llc, Cactus Jack Enterprises, Llc, Cactus Jack Studios, Llc, And Laflame Enterprises, Inc

12/05/2022: Original Answer Of Defendants Jacques Bermon Webster Ii A/K/A Travis Scott A/K/A Cactus Jack, Xx Global, Inc., Cactus Jack Records, Llc, Cactus Jack Enterprises, Llc, Cactus Jack Studios, Llc, And Laflame Enterprises, Inc

Citation-State Patrol Services.

12/05/2022: Citation-State Patrol Services.

Return of Service.

12/01/2022: Return of Service.

Return of service.

11/30/2022: Return of service.

Affidavit of service

11/29/2022: Affidavit of service

Affidavit of service

11/29/2022: Affidavit of service

39 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: SPECIAL APPEARANCE; Filing Attorney: ESPEY, RICHARD; Person Filing: TRISTAR SPORTS & ENTERTAINMENT GROUP INC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER; Filing Attorney: BRINSON, PHILIP ROBERT; Person Filing: HICKS, TREY;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: MOYE, WILLIAM RICHARDS; Person Filing: BWG INC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: RYAN, ELIZABETH YVONNE; Person Filing: APPLE INC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • DocketDescription: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • DocketDescription: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • DocketDescription: JURY DEMAND MADE (TRCP 216);

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • DocketDescription: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • DocketDescription: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • DocketDescription: JURY DEMAND MADE (TRCP 216);

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
107 More Docket Entries
  • 11/04/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: HAYNES, KEVIN CLYDE; Person Filing: FLOWERS, ANTARIO;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: HAYNES, KEVIN CLYDE; Person Filing: FORRIS, JERMEY;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: HAYNES, KEVIN CLYDE; Person Filing: FENLEY, KRIS JR;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • DocketDescription: REFERRED TO PRE-TRIAL COURT;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: HAYNES, KEVIN CLYDE; Person Filing: BHANGAR, SHAHEER;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: HAYNES, KEVIN CLYDE; Person Filing: GOUDEAU, CARL;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: HAYNES, KEVIN CLYDE; Person Filing: GREEN, ERROLL;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: HAYNES, KEVIN CLYDE; Person Filing: GARCIA, GERARDO;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: HAYNES, KEVIN CLYDE; Person Filing: FRANCOIS, FRANCESCA;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: HAYNES, KEVIN CLYDE; Person Filing: FRAZIER, KALEB;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less