Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 05/22/2021 at 07:27:41 (UTC).

BEAL, CARLOS vs. 99 CENTS ONLY STORES LLC

Case Summary

On 04/28/2021 BEAL, CARLOS filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against 99 CENTS ONLY STORES LLC. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL GOMEZ. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****5258

  • Filing Date:

    04/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

MICHAEL GOMEZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BEAL, CARLOS

Defendants

99 CENTS ONLY STORES LLC

99 CENTS ONLY STORES TEXAS INC

Others

99 CENTS ONLY STORES LLC MAY BE SERVED BY AND THROUGH ITS REGISTERED

Dallas, TX 75201

99 CENTS ONLY STORES TEXAS INC MAY BE SERVED BY AND THROUGH ITS

Dallas, TX 75201

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

AKERS, BROCK C.

Defendant Attorney

GRIFFIN, MICHAEL JOHN III

 

Court Documents

Defendant's Original Answer and Demand for Jury Trial

05/19/2021: Defendant's Original Answer and Demand for Jury Trial

Proposed Order

05/20/2021: Proposed Order

Motion to Withdraw as Counsel

05/20/2021: Motion to Withdraw as Counsel

REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SERVICE

04/28/2021: REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SERVICE

REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SERVICE

04/28/2021: REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SERVICE

PLAINTIFFS ORIGINAL PETITION

04/28/2021: PLAINTIFFS ORIGINAL PETITION

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER; Filing Attorney: GRIFFIN, MICHAEL JOHN III; Person Filing: 99 CENTS ONLY STORES TEXAS INC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketDescription: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketDescription: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER; Filing Attorney: GRIFFIN, MICHAEL JOHN III; Person Filing: 99 CENTS ONLY STORES LLC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: 99 CENTS ONLY STORES TEXAS INC MAY BE SERVED BY AND THROUGH ITS; Issued: 4/28/2021; Tracking: 73865462; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: 99 CENTS ONLY STORES LLC MAY BE SERVED BY AND THROUGH ITS REGISTERED; Issued: 4/28/2021; Tracking: 73865460; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: AKERS, BROCK C.; Person Filing: BEAL, CARLOS;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where 99 Cents Only Stores Texas, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where 99 Cents Only Stores LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GRIFFIN III, MICHAEL JOHN