This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 07/09/2015 at 11:48:06 (UTC).

BEACHAM, JULIAN D SR vs. A W CHESTERTON CO

Case Summary

On 08/16/2005 BEACHAM, JULIAN D SR filed an Other - Complex Tort/Class Action lawsuit against A W CHESTERTON CO. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****6355

  • Filing Date:

    08/16/2005

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Complex Tort/Class Action

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Defendants

BEACHAM, JULIAN D SR

KELLY-MOORE PAINT COMPANY INC

METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY

AMERICAN STANDARD INC

AURORA PUMP COMPANY

ELLIOTT COMPANY

YEOMANS CHICAGO CORPORATION

AQUA-CHEM INC (D/B/A CLEAVER-BROOKS DIVISION)

CLEAVER-BROOKS DIVISION

BABCOCK BORSIG POWER INC (F/K/A D B RILEY INC F/K/A RILEY STOKER

D B RILEY INC

GUARDLINE INC (INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO TWENTIETH

TWENTIETH CENTURY GLOVE CORPORATION

DE LAVAL TURBINE INC

INGERSOLL-RAND COMPANY

KEWANEE BOILER CORPORATION

OWENS-ILLINOIS GLASS COMPANY

GLEN ALDEN CORPORATION

BRIGGS MANUFACTURING CO

PHILIP CAREY CORPORATION

118 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

WATHEN, FRANK J. II

WADE, TODD N.

OLD, JAMES ROWLAND JR.

HEMPFLING, LESLEY

ROACH, CRYSTAL

THACKSTON, ROBERT EDWIN

JACKSON, JESSICA S.

WHITE, CLAY M.

HAMILTON, PAUL EDWARD

WILKINSON, ROBERT W

FRASE, LAURA ANN

Other Attorneys

VANCE, VANESSA LEE

POWERS, JAMES H.

ADAMS, ROBERT L.

STUART, KIMBERLY ROSE

VANCLEAVE, MARK DEAN

LYNN, LAWRENCE A.

FOLEY, KEITH WILLIAM

BAILEY, MELVIN DAVID

ALMQUIST, ARTHUR RAY

17 More Attorneys Available

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/16/2012
  • MOTION TO REMOVE TRIAL READY STATUS GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2010
  • ORDER FOR INTERLOCUTORY SUMMARY JUDGMENT SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2009
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2009
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2009
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2009
  • ORDER FOR INTERLOCUTORY SUMMARY JUDGMENT SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2009
  • ORDER FOR INTERLOCUTORY SUMMARY JUDGMENT SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2009
  • ORDER FOR INTERLOCUTORY SUMMARY JUDGMENT SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2009
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2009
  • ORDER FOR INTERLOCUTORY SUMMARY JUDGMENT SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
109 More Docket Entries
  • 11/09/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - LOFTIN, STEPHEN MCBRIDE Person Filing - T H AGRICULTURE & NUTRITION L L C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2005
  • ANSWER CROSS ACTION : Filing Attorney - COLE, RYAN GRANT Person Filing - IMO INDUSTRIES INC (INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN- INTEREST TO DE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2005
  • CROSS ACTION : Filing Attorney - OLD, JAMES ROWLAND JR. Person Filing - AMERICAN STANDARD INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2005
  • DESIGNATED TRIAL READY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - COLE, RYAN GRANT Person Filing - IMO INDUSTRIES INC (INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN- INTEREST TO DE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - OLD, JAMES ROWLAND JR. Person Filing - AMERICAN STANDARD INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - OLIVER, DAVID ARTHUR JR. Person Filing - GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER CO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2005
  • JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2005
  • JURY DEMAND MADE (TRCP 216)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2005
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - HART, ROLA S Person Filing - BEACHAM, JULIAN D SR

    Read MoreRead Less