This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 07/06/2015 at 00:44:38 (UTC).

BEACH, DOROTHY RUTH (IND AND AS PERSONAL vs. A W CHESTERTON

Case Summary

On 01/05/2005 BEACH, DOROTHY RUTH IND AND AS PERSONAL filed an Other - Complex Tort/Class Action lawsuit against A W CHESTERTON. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1281

  • Filing Date:

    01/05/2005

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Complex Tort/Class Action

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Defendants

BEACH, DOROTHY RUTH (IND AND AS PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF THE HEIRS

BEACH, ANDREW

BEACH, ANDY PAUL

BEACH, DOROTHY RUTH

BEACH, JILL

BEACH, LORI

BEACH, SUSAN MARIE

ROSS, LUANNE

AMERICAN STANDARD INC

RICHEY, LORI (IND AND AS PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF THE HEIRS AND

BEACH, DOROTHY (WIFE OF DECEDENT ANDREW BEACH)

BEACH, ANDY PAUL (SON OF DECEDENT ANDREW BEACH)

BEACH, SUAN MARIE (DAUGHTER OF DECEDENT ANDREW BEACH)

ROSS, LUANNE (DAUGHTER OF DECEDENT ANDREW BEACH)

BEACH, JILL (DAUGHTER OF DECEDENT ANDREW BEACH

A W CHESTERTON

ANY AND ALL DEFENDANTS IN PLAINTIFFS PETITION OR AMENDMENTS THERETO OR

ZURN INDUSTRIES INC

DURABLA MANUFACTURING COMPANY INC

CERTAINTEED CORPORATION

14 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

FONVILLE, CHRISTOPHER JOSEPH

WATHEN, FRANK J. II

OLD, JAMES ROWLAND JR.

BIRGE, ERIC R.

HUEBER, SUSAN JAN

WRIGHT, ROBIN WADE

HARDING, LISA D.

ELLISTON, GARY D.

Other Attorneys

BAILEY, MELVIN DAVID

IRVIN, JASON JAMES

FOLEY, JAMES THOMAS III

FOLEY, KEITH WILLIAM

LOWERY, JAMES A. III

WHITE, CLAY M.

FRASE, LAURA ANN

OLIVER, DAVID ARTHUR JR.

BLIZZARD, JOSEPH

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/29/2013
  • PARTIAL REMOVAL TO BANKRUPTCY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2011
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2006
  • FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - BIRGE, ERIC R. Person Filing - RICHEY, LORI (IND AND AS PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF THE HEIRS AND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2006
  • FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - BIRGE, ERIC R. Person Filing - BEACH, JILL (DAUGHTER OF DECEDENT ANDREW BEACH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2006
  • FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - BIRGE, ERIC R. Person Filing - BEACH, DOROTHY (WIFE OF DECEDENT ANDREW BEACH)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2006
  • FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - BIRGE, ERIC R. Person Filing - BEACH, SUAN MARIE (DAUGHTER OF DECEDENT ANDREW BEACH)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2006
  • FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - BIRGE, ERIC R. Person Filing - ROSS, LUANNE (DAUGHTER OF DECEDENT ANDREW BEACH)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2006
  • FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - BIRGE, ERIC R. Person Filing - BEACH, ANDY PAUL (SON OF DECEDENT ANDREW BEACH)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - WHITE, CLAY M. Person Filing - CLEAVER-BROOKS DIVISION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - WHITE, CLAY M. Person Filing - AQUA-CHEM INC D/B/A CLEAVER-BROOKS DIVISION

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 01/05/2005
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - FONVILLE, CHRISTOPHER JOSEPH Person Filing - BEACH, DOROTHY RUTH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2005
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - FONVILLE, CHRISTOPHER JOSEPH Person Filing - ROSS, LUANNE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - OLD, JAMES ROWLAND JR. Person Filing - AMERICAN STANDARD INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2005
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - FONVILLE, CHRISTOPHER JOSEPH Person Filing - BEACH, DOROTHY RUTH (IND AND AS PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF THE HEIRS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2005
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - FONVILLE, CHRISTOPHER JOSEPH Person Filing - BEACH, LORI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2005
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - FONVILLE, CHRISTOPHER JOSEPH Person Filing - BEACH, JILL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2005
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - FONVILLE, CHRISTOPHER JOSEPH Person Filing - BEACH, ANDREW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2005
  • CROSS ACTION : Filing Attorney - OLD, JAMES ROWLAND JR. Person Filing - AMERICAN STANDARD INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2005
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - FONVILLE, CHRISTOPHER JOSEPH Person Filing - BEACH, ANDY PAUL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2005
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - FONVILLE, CHRISTOPHER JOSEPH Person Filing - BEACH, SUSAN MARIE

    Read MoreRead Less