This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 06/19/2020 at 07:15:55 (UTC).

BAYOU SOCIAL CLUB LLC (DBA PRIME SOCIAL) vs. YUWEI ENTERPRISE INC

Case Summary

On 05/26/2020 BAYOU SOCIAL CLUB LLC DBA PRIME SOCIAL filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against YUWEI ENTERPRISE INC. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is ELAINE H PALMER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1318

  • Filing Date:

    05/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

ELAINE H PALMER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

PRIME SOCIAL

BAYOU SOCIAL CLUB LLC (DBA PRIME SOCIAL)

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

YUWEI ENTERPRISE INC

Other

YUWEI ENTERPRISE INC (TEXAS CORPORATION) MAY BE SERVED THROUGH

150 Westsam Houston Parkway Suite 1133

Houston, TX 77024

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DIAMANT, JEFFREY NOLAN

909 Fannin St

Houston, TX 77010

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

LOETZERICH, DEREK WILLIAMS

 

Court Documents

Letter to Clerk

06/04/2020: Letter to Clerk

Jury Demand

06/04/2020: Jury Demand

Letter to Clerk

06/08/2020: Letter to Clerk

Exhibit 5

06/09/2020: Exhibit 5

Exhibit 2

06/09/2020: Exhibit 2

Letter to Court (TRO Exhibits)

06/09/2020: Letter to Court (TRO Exhibits)

Proposed Temporary Restraining Order

06/09/2020: Proposed Temporary Restraining Order

Notice of Hearing on Application for Temporary Restraining Order

06/09/2020: Notice of Hearing on Application for Temporary Restraining Order

Letter

06/11/2020: Letter

Clerk's certificate of cash deposit in lieu of injunction bond per order of the court

06/11/2020: Clerk's certificate of cash deposit in lieu of injunction bond per order of the court

Letter to Clerk

06/12/2020: Letter to Clerk

Order on Motion for Expedited Discovery

06/15/2020: Order on Motion for Expedited Discovery

Exhibit B

06/15/2020: Exhibit B

Exhibit A

06/15/2020: Exhibit A

Yuwei Enterprise Inc Original Answer

06/15/2020: Yuwei Enterprise Inc Original Answer

Exhibit B

05/26/2020: Exhibit B

Civil Process Request Form

05/26/2020: Civil Process Request Form

Plaintiffs Original Petition and Application for Temporary Restraining Order, Temporary Injunction and Permanent Injunction Relief

05/26/2020: Plaintiffs Original Petition and Application for Temporary Restraining Order, Temporary Injunction and Permanent Injunction Relief

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/29/2020
  • HearingCourt: 215; Docket Type: Law Day Docket; Reason: TEMPORARY INJUNCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: LOETZERICH, DEREK WILLIAMS; Person Filing: YUWEI ENTERPRISE INC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • DocketDescription: COUNTER CLAIM; Filing Attorney: LOETZERICH, DEREK WILLIAMS; Person Filing: YUWEI ENTERPRISE INC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • DocketType of Service: TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER; Person: YUWEI ENTERPRISE INC (TEXAS CORPORATION) MAY BE SERVED THROUGH; Issued: 6/12/2020; Tracking: 73757680; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORDER SETTING BOND SIGNED; Order Signed: 6/10/2020;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • DocketDescription: MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER GRANTED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • DocketDescription: APPEARANCE ON TEMPORARY INJ OR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORD;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORDER SIGNED SETTING HEARING; Order Signed: 6/10/2020;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORDER SIGNED GRANTING TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER; Order Signed: 6/10/2020;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • DocketDescription: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION CORPORATE; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: YUWEI ENTERPRISE INC (TEXAS CORPORATION) MAY BE SERVED THROUGH; Issued: 6/5/2020; Tracking: 73755785; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: DIAMANT, JEFFREY NOLAN; Person Filing: BAYOU SOCIAL CLUB LLC (DBA PRIME SOCIAL);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: DIAMANT, JEFFREY NOLAN; Person Filing: PRIME SOCIAL;

    Read MoreRead Less