This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 05/27/2022 at 07:48:47 (UTC).

BAUTISTA, MAURA vs. LANDMARK INDUSTRIES LLC

Case Summary

On 05/03/2022 BAUTISTA, MAURA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against LANDMARK INDUSTRIES LLC. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL GOMEZ. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****6569

  • Filing Date:

    05/03/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

MICHAEL GOMEZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BAUTISTA, MAURA

Defendants

LANDMARK INDUSTRIES LLC

LANDMARK INDUSTRIES ENERGY LLC

LANDMARK INDUSTRIES ENERGY LLC (D/B/A TIMEWISE FOOD STORES)

TEXAS PETROLEUM GROUP LLC

TEXAS PETROLEUM GROUP LLC(D/B/A TIMEWISE FOOD STORES)

EXXON MOBIL CORPORATION

TIMEWISE FOOD STORES

Others

LANDMARK INDUSTRIES LLC MAY BE SERVED BY SERVING ITS REGISTERED AGENT

11111 Wilcrest Green Ste 100

Houston, TX 77042

LANDMARK INDUSTRIES ENERGY LLC MAY BE SERVED BYSERVING ITS REGISTERED

11111 Wilcrest Green Ste 100

Houston, TX 77042

LANDMARK INDUSTRIES ENERGY LLC (D/B/A TIMEWISE FOOD STORES) MAY BE

11111 Wilcrest Green Ste 100

Houston, TX 77042

TEXAS PETROLEUM GROUP LLC MAY BE SERVED BYSERVING ITS REGISTERED AGENT

11111 Wilcrest Green Ste 100

Houston, TX 77042

TEXAS PETROLEUM GROUP LLC (D/B/A TIMEWISE FOOD STORES) MAY BE

11111 Wilcrest Green Ste 100

Houston, TX 77042

EXXON MOBIL CORPORATION MAY BE SERVED BY SERVING ITS REGISTERED AGENT

211 E 7Th Street Suite 620

Austin, TX 78701

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MALOUF, JOSEPH

Defendant Attorney

ZITO, NICHOLAS E.

 

Court Documents

Return Of Service

05/12/2022: Return Of Service

Return Of Service

05/12/2022: Return Of Service

Return Of Service

05/12/2022: Return Of Service

Return Of Service

05/12/2022: Return Of Service

Return Of Service

05/12/2022: Return Of Service

Return Of Service To Exxon Mobil Corporation

05/13/2022: Return Of Service To Exxon Mobil Corporation

Defendants' Jury Demand

05/19/2022: Defendants' Jury Demand

Defendants' Original Answer

05/19/2022: Defendants' Original Answer

Proposed Order of Dismissal Without Prejudice

05/23/2022: Proposed Order of Dismissal Without Prejudice

Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss Without Prejudice

05/23/2022: Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss Without Prejudice

NO COSTS ALLOCATED

05/24/2022: NO COSTS ALLOCATED

Request for Issuance of Service

05/03/2022: Request for Issuance of Service

Request for Issuance of Service

05/03/2022: Request for Issuance of Service

Request for Issuance of Service

05/03/2022: Request for Issuance of Service

Request for Issuance of Service

05/03/2022: Request for Issuance of Service

Request for Issuance of Service

05/03/2022: Request for Issuance of Service

Request for Issuance of Service

05/03/2022: Request for Issuance of Service

COVER LETTER

05/03/2022: COVER LETTER

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/24/2022
  • DocketDescription: PARTIAL DISMISSAL ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION; Order Signed: 5/24/2022;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • DocketDescription: NO COSTS ALLOCATED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER; Filing Attorney: ZITO, NICHOLAS E.; Person Filing: LANDMARK INDUSTRIES LLC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER; Filing Attorney: ZITO, NICHOLAS E.; Person Filing: LANDMARK INDUSTRIES ENERGY LLC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketDescription: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketDescription: JURY DEMAND MADE (TRCP 216);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: EXXON MOBIL CORPORATION MAY BE SERVED BY SERVING ITS REGISTERED AGENT; Issued: 5/6/2022; Served: 5/10/2022; Received: 5/13/2022; Tracking: 74002754; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: TEXAS PETROLEUM GROUP LLC (D/B/A TIMEWISE FOOD STORES) MAY BE; Issued: 5/6/2022; Served: 5/9/2022; Received: 5/12/2022; Tracking: 74002753; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: TEXAS PETROLEUM GROUP LLC MAY BE SERVED BYSERVING ITS REGISTERED AGENT; Issued: 5/6/2022; Served: 5/9/2022; Received: 5/12/2022; Tracking: 74002751; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: LANDMARK INDUSTRIES ENERGY LLC (D/B/A TIMEWISE FOOD STORES) MAY BE; Issued: 5/6/2022; Served: 5/9/2022; Received: 5/12/2022; Tracking: 74002750; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: LANDMARK INDUSTRIES ENERGY LLC MAY BE SERVED BYSERVING ITS REGISTERED; Issued: 5/6/2022; Served: 5/9/2022; Received: 5/12/2022; Tracking: 74002748; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: LANDMARK INDUSTRIES LLC MAY BE SERVED BY SERVING ITS REGISTERED AGENT; Issued: 5/6/2022; Tracking: 74002747; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: MALOUF, JOSEPH; Person Filing: BAUTISTA, MAURA;

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LANDMARK INDUSTRIES LLC (D/B/A TIMEWISE SHELL AND D/B/A TIMEWISE FOOD is a litigant

Latest cases where TIMEWISE FOOD STORES #208 is a litigant

Latest cases where LANDMARK INDUSTRIES ENERGY LLC (D/B/A TIMEWISE SHELL AND D/B/A is a litigant

Latest cases where TEXAS PETROLEUM GROUP LLC is a litigant