This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 07/30/2020 at 07:54:17 (UTC).

BARBER, CHARLOTTE vs. HARRIS COUNTY CONSTABLE'S OFFICE PRECINCT FOUR

Case Summary

On 07/06/2020 BARBER, CHARLOTTE filed an Other - Expungement lawsuit against HARRIS COUNTY CONSTABLE'S OFFICE PRECINCT FOUR. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is JUDGE PRESIDING. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****9802

  • Filing Date:

    07/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Expungement

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

JUDGE PRESIDING

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BARBER, CHARLOTTE

Defendants

HARRIS COUNTY CONSTABLE'S OFFICE PRECINCT ONE

1302 Preston,

Houston, TX 77002

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE

HARRIS COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE

TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY; CRIME RECORDS SERVICE MSC 0234

HARRIS COUNTY PRETRIAL SERVICES

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT CLERK'S OFFICE

HARRIS COUNTY CONSTABLE'S OFFICE PRECINCT FOUR

6831 Cypresswood Drive

Spring, TX 77379

Others

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT CLERK'S OFFICE BY SERVING RANDALL SMIDT

1310 Prairie Ste 880

Houston, TX 77002

HARRIS COUNTY PRETRIAL SERVICES BY SERVING KELVIN L BANKS DIRECTOR

102 San Jacinto

Houston, TX 77002

TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY BY SERVING EXPUNCTION UNIT

Po Box 4143

Austin, TX 78765

HARRIS COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE BY SERVING MAJOR MAC MCKELVY

1200 Baker Street

Houston, TX 77011

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE BY SERVING SCOTT A DURFEE

1310 Prairie 5Th Floor

Houston, TX 77002

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MCLAUGHLIN, TONYA ROLLAND

ROLLAND, TONYA A

1523 Yale Stree

Houston, TX 77008

Defendant Attorney

SCOTT, MEAGAN THERESE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/24/2020
  • HearingCourt: 164; Docket Type: Law Day Docket; Reason: EXPUNCTION; Results: Passed; Comments: PER TAMARA BY PHONE 7.29 @ 9:30AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • DocketDescription: HOLD FOR JUDGMENT;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: SCOTT, MEAGAN THERESE; Person Filing: HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY CONSTABLE'S OFFICE PRECINCT ONE; Issued: 7/17/2020; Served: 7/20/2020; Tracking: 73768329; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY CONSTABLE'S OFFICE PRECINCT FOUR; Issued: 7/17/2020; Served: 7/27/2020; Tracking: 73768328; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE BY SERVING MAJOR MAC MCKELVY; Issued: 7/17/2020; Tracking: 73766681; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY PRETRIAL SERVICES BY SERVING KELVIN L BANKS DIRECTOR; Issued: 7/17/2020; Tracking: 73766680; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT CLERK'S OFFICE BY SERVING RANDALL SMIDT; Issued: 7/17/2020; Tracking: 73766679; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE BY SERVING SCOTT A DURFEE; Issued: 7/17/2020; Tracking: 73766677; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY BY SERVING EXPUNCTION UNIT; Issued: 7/17/2020; Tracking: 73766676; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORDER SIGNED SETTING HEARING; Order Signed: 7/10/2020;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: ROLLAND, TONYA A; Person Filing: BARBER, CHARLOTTE;

    Read MoreRead Less