This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 06/18/2015 at 23:22:20 (UTC).

BANK OF NEW YORK (AS TRUSTEE AND ITS SUC vs. WILLIAMS, SHIRLEY A

Case Summary

On 12/02/2004 BANK OF NEW YORK AS TRUSTEE AND ITS SUC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against WILLIAMS, SHIRLEY A. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****8569

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2004

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BANK OF NEW YORK (AS TRUSTEE AND ITS SUCCESSORS OR ASSIGNS)

Defendant

WILLIAMS, SHIRLEY A

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BRAITHWAITE, BRIDGET ANNE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/08/2005
  • DISMISSED ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2005
  • NO COSTS ALLOCATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2005
  • MOTION TO REINSTATE GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2005
  • REINSTATEMENT ON COURT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2005
  • ORDER SIGNED SETTING ASIDE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2005
  • EXPEDITED DEFAULT JDGMT SGND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2005
  • DEFENDANT COSTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2005
  • MOTION TO REINSTATE GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2005
  • REINSTATEMENT ON COURT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2005
  • DISMISSED FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2005
  • NO COSTS ALLOCATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2004
  • TRANSFERRED TO ANOTHER HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2004
  • TRANSFERRED TO HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2004
  • ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO ANOTHER DISTRICT COURT SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2004
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - BRAITHWAITE, BRIDGET ANNE Person Filing - BANK OF NEW YORK (AS TRUSTEE AND ITS SUCCESSORS OR ASSIGNS)

    Read MoreRead Less