This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 04/06/2020 at 07:26:20 (UTC).

BADARPURA, FAIZA vs. SHANDONG LINGLONG TYRE CO LTD

Case Summary

On 03/13/2020 BADARPURA, FAIZA filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against SHANDONG LINGLONG TYRE CO LTD. This case was filed in Harris County District Courthouse, Harris County District Courthouse located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is KRISTEN BRAUCHLE HAWKINS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****7222

  • Filing Date:

    03/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

KRISTEN BRAUCHLE HAWKINS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BADARPURA, FAIZA

Defendants

EL MANTE TIRE SHOP NO 1

LINGLONG NORTH AMERICA LLC

HORIZON TIRE INC

HORIZON TIRE INC (D/B/A HORIZON TIRE CORPORATION)

HORIZON TIRE CORPORATION

SHANDONG LINGLONG TYRE CO LTD

LINGLONG AMERICAS INC

GONZALEZ GARCIA,GLORIA (D/B/A EL MANTE TIRE SHOP NO 1)

Others and Defendants

LINGLONG NORTH AMERICA LLC (OHIO LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY) MAY BE

GONZALEZ GARCIA,GLORIA (D/B/A EL MANTE TIRE SHOP NO 1)

SHANDONG LINGLONG TYRE CO LTD (FOREIGN CORPORATION) MAY BE SERVED

HORIZON TIRE INC (D/B/A HORIZON TIRE CORPORATION) (TEXAS CORPORATION)

HORIZON TIRE INC (CALIFORNIA CORPORATION) MAY BE SERVED

LINGLONG AMERICAS INC (OHIO CORPORATION) MAY BE SERVED THROUGH ITS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ARMSTRONG, SCOTT PARKER

 

Court Documents

Plaintiff's Original Petition and Request for Disclosure

03/13/2020: Plaintiff's Original Petition and Request for Disclosure

Request for Issuance of Service

03/13/2020: Request for Issuance of Service

Request for Issuance of Service

03/13/2020: Request for Issuance of Service

Request for Issuance of Service

03/13/2020: Request for Issuance of Service

Request for Issuance of Service

03/13/2020: Request for Issuance of Service

Request for Issuance of Service

03/13/2020: Request for Issuance of Service

Request for Issuance of Service

03/13/2020: Request for Issuance of Service

Return of Service-Linglong North America LLC.

03/30/2020: Return of Service-Linglong North America LLC.

Return of Service Gloria Gonzalez Garcia .

03/25/2020: Return of Service Gloria Gonzalez Garcia .

Return of Service-Linglong Americas Inc.

03/20/2020: Return of Service-Linglong Americas Inc.

LTR to Clerk re Shandong Linglong Citation

03/18/2020: LTR to Clerk re Shandong Linglong Citation

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/13/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: ARMSTRONG, SCOTT PARKER; Person Filing: BADARPURA, FAIZA;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less