This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 09/25/2018 at 20:42:22 (UTC).

AYSHA INVESTMENTS INC vs. UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS OF LONDON (SUBSCR

Case Summary

On 01/27/2016 AYSHA INVESTMENTS INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS OF LONDON SUBSCR. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is KYLE CARTER. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****5241

  • Filing Date:

    01/27/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

KYLE CARTER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AYSHA INVESTMENTS INC

9303 Fondren Road

Houston, TX 77074

Defendants

WHEELER DEFUSCO AND ASSOCIATES

JEFFERSON, FREDERIC KEITH

Houston, TX 77003

UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS OF LONDON (SUBSCRIBING TO POLICY NUMBER

750 Seventh Avenue

New York, NY 10019

WHEELER DEFUSCO AND ASSOCIATES LLC

1509 Ne 4Th Avenue

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33304

Other

CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS OF LONDON C/O MENDES AND MOUNT LLP

Not Classified By Court

FJELDAL, TIMOTHY A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WILSON, CHAD TROY

Defendant Attorney

COLLINS, JAMES PRICE

 

Court Documents

Letter to Clerk

01/27/2016: Letter to Clerk

Plaintiffs Original Petition Jury Demand And Request For Disclosure

01/27/2016: Plaintiffs Original Petition Jury Demand And Request For Disclosure

Certified Mail Tracking Number 7015 0640 0004 5594 4129

01/29/2016: Certified Mail Tracking Number 7015 0640 0004 5594 4129

Certified Mail Tracking Number 7015 0640 0004 5594 4112

01/29/2016: Certified Mail Tracking Number 7015 0640 0004 5594 4112

Certified Mail Tracking Number 7015 0640 0004 5594 4105

01/29/2016: Certified Mail Tracking Number 7015 0640 0004 5594 4105

Domestic Return Receipt

02/16/2016: Domestic Return Receipt

Citation (Certified)

03/14/2016: Citation (Certified)

DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED

06/08/2016: DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED

Plaintiffs Designation Of Expert And Fact Witnesses

10/31/2016: Plaintiffs Designation Of Expert And Fact Witnesses

TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER SIGNED

11/17/2016: TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER SIGNED

Joint First Motion for Continuance and Request for New Docket Control Order

12/19/2016: Joint First Motion for Continuance and Request for New Docket Control Order

Notice of Settlement

03/27/2017: Notice of Settlement

REINSTATEMENT ON COURT ORDER

05/15/2017: REINSTATEMENT ON COURT ORDER

Exhibit B

05/15/2017: Exhibit B

Exhibit A

05/15/2017: Exhibit A

TRIAL SETTING

05/25/2017: TRIAL SETTING

Plaintiff's Notice of Nonsuit with Prejudice

06/26/2017: Plaintiff's Notice of Nonsuit with Prejudice

ORDER OF NON-SUIT SIGNED

06/27/2017: ORDER OF NON-SUIT SIGNED

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/27/2017
  • Description: ORDER OF NON-SUIT SIGNED; Order Signed: 6/27/2017;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • Description: EACH PAY OWN;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2017
  • Description: DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED; Order Signed: 6/13/2017;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2017
  • Description: ORDER SIGNED GRANTING REFERRAL TO MEDIATION; Order Signed: 6/2/2017;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • Description: DESIGNATED TRIAL READY;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2017
  • Description: EACH PAY OWN;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2017
  • Description: ORDER OF NON-SUIT SIGNED; Order Signed: 5/15/2017;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2017
  • Description: REINSTATEMENT ON COURT ORDER; Order Signed: 5/15/2017;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2017
  • Description: MOTION TO REINSTATE GRANTED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2016
  • Description: ORDER SIGNED RESETTING TRIAL; Order Signed: 12/30/2016;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2016
  • Description: ORDER SIGNED GRANTING TRIAL CONTINUANCE; Order Signed: 12/20/2016;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2016
  • Description: TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER SIGNED; Order Signed: 11/17/2016;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2016
  • Description: DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED; Order Signed: 6/8/2016;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2016
  • Description: DESIGNATED TRIAL READY;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2016
  • Description: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: COLLINS, JAMES PRICE; Person Filing: UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS OF LONDON (SUBSCRIBING TO POLICY NUMBER;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2016
  • Description: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: COLLINS, JAMES PRICE; Person Filing: WHEELER DEFUSCO AND ASSOCIATES LLC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2016
  • Description: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2016
  • Description: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: WILSON, CHAD TROY; Person Filing: AYSHA INVESTMENTS INC;

    Read MoreRead Less