This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 10/14/2022 at 07:24:15 (UTC).

AXIOM EQUITY INVESTMENTS II LLC vs. HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT

Case Summary

On 09/20/2022 AXIOM EQUITY INVESTMENTS II LLC filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT. This case was filed in Harris County District Courthouse, Harris County District Courthouse located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is DAWN ROGERS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0074

  • Filing Date:

    09/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

DAWN ROGERS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AXIOM EQUITY INVESTMENTS II LLC

Defendant

HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT

Other

HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT (A POLITICAL SUBDIVISION OF THE STATE

13013 Northwest Freeway

Houston, TX 77040

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHEEK, LYNDSEY MICHELLE

 

Court Documents

Plaintiff's Original Petition

09/20/2022: Plaintiff's Original Petition

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/20/2022
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT (A POLITICAL SUBDIVISION OF THE STATE; Issued: 9/21/2022; Served: 10/5/2022; Received: 10/11/2022; Tracking: 74054407; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: CHEEK, LYNDSEY MICHELLE; Person Filing: AXIOM EQUITY INVESTMENTS II LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Lenox DBA Axiom Equity Investments II is a litigant

Latest cases where HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHEEK, LYNDSEY MICHELLE