This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 02/15/2021 at 07:29:27 (UTC).

AVILLA, ALBERTO vs. LANDMARK INDUSTRIES LLC

Case Summary

On 01/22/2021 AVILLA, ALBERTO filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against LANDMARK INDUSTRIES LLC. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is DAWN ROGERS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****4039

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

DAWN ROGERS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AVILLA, ALBERTO

Defendants

SIENNA FOODS INC

LANDMARK INDUSTRIES LLC

MCDONALD'S RESTAURANTS OF TEXAS INC

Others

SIENNA FOODS INC A DOMESTIC FOR-PROFIT CORPORATION MAY BE SERVED BY

1921 Southwest Freeway

Houston, TX 77098

MCDONALD'S RESTAURANTS OF TEXAS INC A DOMESTIC FOR-PROFIT CORPORATION

211 E 7Th Street Suite 620

Austin, TX 78701

LANDMARK INDUSTRIES LLC MAY BE SERVED BY SERVING ITS REGISTERED AGENT

11111 Wilcrest Green Suite 100

Houston, TX 77042

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GLAZE, JORDAN A

Defendant Attorney

FAZIO, GERARD THOMAS

 

Court Documents

Certified Mail Tracking Number 7018 2290 3523 9392

01/25/2021: Certified Mail Tracking Number 7018 2290 3523 9392

Certified Mail Tracking Number 7018 2290 0001 3523 9385

01/25/2021: Certified Mail Tracking Number 7018 2290 0001 3523 9385

Certified Mail Tracking Number 7018 2290 0001 3523 9330

01/25/2021: Certified Mail Tracking Number 7018 2290 0001 3523 9330

PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE

01/22/2021: PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE

Defendant Landmark Industries, LLC's Original Answer to Plaintiff's Original Petition

02/09/2021: Defendant Landmark Industries, LLC's Original Answer to Plaintiff's Original Petition

Certified Mail Receipt

01/25/2021: Certified Mail Receipt

Certified Mail Receipt

01/25/2021: Certified Mail Receipt

Certified Mail Receipt

01/25/2021: Certified Mail Receipt

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: FAZIO, GERARD THOMAS; Person Filing: LANDMARK INDUSTRIES LLC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (CERTIFIED); Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: SIENNA FOODS INC A DOMESTIC FOR-PROFIT CORPORATION MAY BE SERVED BY; Issued: 1/25/2021; Tracking: 73833806; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (CERTIFIED); Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: MCDONALD'S RESTAURANTS OF TEXAS INC A DOMESTIC FOR-PROFIT CORPORATION; Issued: 1/25/2021; Tracking: 73833805; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (CERTIFIED); Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: LANDMARK INDUSTRIES LLC MAY BE SERVED BY SERVING ITS REGISTERED AGENT; Issued: 1/25/2021; Tracking: 73833804; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: GLAZE, JORDAN ANDREW; Person Filing: AVILLA, ALBERTO;

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LANDMARK INDUSTRIES LLC (D/B/A TIMEWISE SHELL AND D/B/A TIMEWISE FOOD is a litigant

Latest cases where McDonald's Restaurants of Texas, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FAZIO, GERARD THOMAS