This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 02/04/2019 at 07:21:47 (UTC).

AVID CONTROLS INC vs. GE ENERGY POWER CONVERSION TECHNOLOGY LTD

Case Summary

On 01/11/2019 AVID CONTROLS INC filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against GE ENERGY POWER CONVERSION TECHNOLOGY LTD. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is FREDERICKA PHILLIPS. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****2599

  • Filing Date:

    01/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

FREDERICKA PHILLIPS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AVID CONTROLS INC

600 Travis Street

Houston, TX 77002

Defendants

CURRENT POWER SOLUTIONS INC

206 9Th Street

Austin, TX 78701

GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY

1999 Bruan Street

Dallas, TX 75201

GE ENERGY POWER CONVERSION TECHNOLOGY LTD

1999 Bryan Street

Dallas, TX 75201

Others

CURRENT POWER SOLUTIONS INC (A DOMESTIC CORPORATION) BY

GE ENERGY POWER CONVERSION TECHNOLOGY LTD BY SERVING ITS

GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY (A FOREIGN FOR PROFIT CORPORATION) BY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BUZBEE, ANTHONY GLENN

600 Travis, St

Houston, TX 77002

 

Court Documents

Civil Process Pick-Up Form

01/14/2019: Civil Process Pick-Up Form

Notice of Oral Hearing On Plaintiff's First Amended Petition And Request For Injunctive Relief

01/15/2019: Notice of Oral Hearing On Plaintiff's First Amended Petition And Request For Injunctive Relief

Plaintiff's Second Amended Verified Petition and Request for Injunctive Relief And Rule 194 Request For Disclosure

01/15/2019: Plaintiff's Second Amended Verified Petition and Request for Injunctive Relief And Rule 194 Request For Disclosure

Notice Of Hearing

01/18/2019: Notice Of Hearing

Exhibit A

01/18/2019: Exhibit A

Motion for Expedited Discovery and Verified Motion for Continuance (Signed)

01/18/2019: Motion for Expedited Discovery and Verified Motion for Continuance (Signed)

Exhibit A

01/22/2019: Exhibit A

GE Defendants' Notice of Filing of Removal

01/22/2019: GE Defendants' Notice of Filing of Removal

Proposed Order Granting GE Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Under the Texas Citizens Participation Act

01/22/2019: Proposed Order Granting GE Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Under the Texas Citizens Participation Act

Declaration of Steven C Messer

01/22/2019: Declaration of Steven C Messer

GE Defendants' Motion to Dismiss

01/22/2019: GE Defendants' Motion to Dismiss

Citation Return

01/22/2019: Citation Return

Citation Corporate

01/22/2019: Citation Corporate

Request for Issuance of Service

01/11/2019: Request for Issuance of Service

Request for Issuance of Service

01/11/2019: Request for Issuance of Service

Plaintiffs Original Petition and Rule 194 Request for Disclosure

01/11/2019: Plaintiffs Original Petition and Rule 194 Request for Disclosure

ORDER SETTING BOND SIGNED

01/15/2019: ORDER SETTING BOND SIGNED

Plaintiff's First Amended Petition and Request for Injunctive Relief

01/15/2019: Plaintiff's First Amended Petition and Request for Injunctive Relief

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/22/2019
  • Description: REMOVED TO FEDERAL COURT;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • Description: ORDER SETTING BOND SIGNED; Order Signed: 1/15/2019;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • Description: ORDER SIGNED SETTING HEARING; Order Signed: 1/15/2019;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • Description: APPEARANCE ON TEMPORARY INJ OR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORD;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • Description: MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER GRANTED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • Description: SECOND AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: BUZBEE, ANTHONY GLENN; Person Filing: AVID CONTROLS INC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • Description: FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: BUZBEE, ANTHONY GLENN; Person Filing: AVID CONTROLS INC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • Description: ORDER SIGNED GRANTING TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER; Order Signed: 1/15/2019;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • Description: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: BUZBEE, ANTHONY GLENN; Person Filing: AVID CONTROLS INC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • Description: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    Read MoreRead Less