This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 10/18/2021 at 08:26:10 (UTC).

AUTOZONE TEXAS L P vs. HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT

Case Summary

On 09/24/2021 AUTOZONE TEXAS L P filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT. This case was filed in Harris County District Courthouse, Harris County District Courthouse located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is ROBERT K. SCHAFFER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****2125

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

ROBERT K. SCHAFFER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

AUTOZONE TEXAS L P

AUTOZONE WEST INC (AKA AUTOZONE INC AS OWNER AND LESSEE)

AUTOZONE INC AS OWNER AND LESSEE

Defendant

HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT

Other

HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT MAY BE SERVED BY SERVING ITS

13013 Northwest Freeway

Houston, TX 77040

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAPINE, HEATHER NICOLE

 

Court Documents

Plaintiffs' Original Petition with Disclosures

09/24/2021: Plaintiffs' Original Petition with Disclosures

Citation (Executed)

10/06/2021: Citation (Executed)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT MAY BE SERVED BY SERVING ITS; Issued: 9/27/2021; Served: 10/4/2021; Returned: 10/5/2021; Received: 10/6/2021; Tracking: 73920804; Deliver To: CONST 1 ALAN ROSEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: CANCELLED BEFORE SERVICE SENT; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT MAY BE SERVED BY SERVING ITS; Issued: 9/27/2021; Tracking: 73920746; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: LAPINE, HEATHER NICOLE; Person Filing: AUTOZONE INC AS OWNER AND LESSEE;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: LAPINE, HEATHER NICOLE; Person Filing: AUTOZONE WEST INC (AKA AUTOZONE INC AS OWNER AND LESSEE);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: LAPINE, HEATHER NICOLE; Person Filing: AUTOZONE TEXAS L P;

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Autozone Texas, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT is a litigant

Latest cases where AUTOZONE WEST, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where AUTOZONE INC. is a litigant