This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 04/08/2021 at 08:02:31 (UTC).

ATSER L P vs. JAMES CONSTRUCTION GROUP LLC (N/K/A PRIMORIS HEAVY CIVIL)

Case Summary

On 03/15/2021 ATSER L P filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against JAMES CONSTRUCTION GROUP LLC N/K/A PRIMORIS HEAVY CIVIL. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is BRITTANYE MORRIS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****4961

  • Filing Date:

    03/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

BRITTANYE MORRIS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ATSER L P

Defendants

FEDERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

JAMES CONSTRUCTION GROUP LLC (N/K/A PRIMORIS HEAVY CIVIL)

P&C GROUP

CHUBB (D/B/A P&C GROUP) (D/B/A FEDERAL INSURANCE COMPANY)

PRIMORIS HEAVY CIVIL

Others

JAMES CONSTRUCTION GROUP L L C (N/K/A PRIMORIS HEAVY CIVIL)

211 East 7Th Street Suite 620

Austin, TX 78701

CHUBB (D/B/A P&C GROUP)(D/B/A FEDERAL INSURANCE COMPANY) MAY BE

820 Bear Tavern Rd West

Trenton, NJ 08628

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WINCHESTER, BRANDON SCOTT

 

Court Documents

Return of Service--CHUBB (D/B/A P&C GROUP)(D/B/A FEDERAL INSURANCE COMPANY)

03/22/2021: Return of Service--CHUBB (D/B/A P&C GROUP)(D/B/A FEDERAL INSURANCE COMPANY)

Request for Issuance of Service

03/15/2021: Request for Issuance of Service

Atser Exhibit N proof of claim 460

03/15/2021: Atser Exhibit N proof of claim 460

Atser Exhibit M proof of claim 679

03/15/2021: Atser Exhibit M proof of claim 679

Court Letter with exhibits and fee payment

03/15/2021: Court Letter with exhibits and fee payment

REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SERVICE

03/15/2021: REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SERVICE

REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SERVICE

03/15/2021: REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SERVICE

EXHIBIT K

03/15/2021: EXHIBIT K

EXHIBIT J

03/15/2021: EXHIBIT J

EXHIBIT I

03/15/2021: EXHIBIT I

EXHIBIT H

03/15/2021: EXHIBIT H

EXHIBIT G

03/15/2021: EXHIBIT G

EXHIBIT F

03/15/2021: EXHIBIT F

EXHIBIT E

03/15/2021: EXHIBIT E

EXHIBIT C

03/15/2021: EXHIBIT C

EXHIBIT B

03/15/2021: EXHIBIT B

PLAINTIFF ATSER L P'S ORIGINAL PETITION AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE

03/15/2021: PLAINTIFF ATSER L P'S ORIGINAL PETITION AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE

Return of Service-JAMES CONSTRUCTION GROUP L L C

03/18/2021: Return of Service-JAMES CONSTRUCTION GROUP L L C

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION(NON-RESIDENT); Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: CHUBB (D/B/A P&C GROUP)(D/B/A FEDERAL INSURANCE COMPANY) MAY BE; Issued: 3/16/2021; Tracking: 73850438; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: JAMES CONSTRUCTION GROUP L L C (N/K/A PRIMORIS HEAVY CIVIL); Issued: 3/16/2021; Served: 3/18/2021; Tracking: 73850434; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: WINCHESTER, BRANDON SCOTT; Person Filing: ATSER L P;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketDescription: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JAMES CONSTRUCTION GROUP, L.L.C. is a litigant

Latest cases where CHUBB & SON (A DIVISION OF THE CHUBB GROUP OF INSURANCE COMPANIES) is a litigant

Latest cases where Federal Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Winchester, Brandon S