This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 12/13/2018 at 07:27:45 (UTC).

ASTORIA RESIDENTIAL LLC vs. NEW YORK MUTUAL LLC

Case Summary

On 11/19/2018 ASTORIA RESIDENTIAL LLC filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against NEW YORK MUTUAL LLC. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is DARYL L. MOORE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****3279

  • Filing Date:

    11/19/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

DARYL L. MOORE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ASTORIA RESIDENTIAL LLC

1409 Post Oak Blvd Unit #2403

Houston, TX 77056

Defendants

NEW YORK MUTUAL LLC

ZEUS MORTGAGE LTD

Others

NEW YORK MUTUAL LLC (TEXAS LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY) BY SERVING

5090 Richmond Avenue Ste 314

Houston, TX 77056

ZEUS MORTGAGE LTD (TEXAS LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY) BY SERVING

5090 Richmond Avenue Ste 314

Houston, TX 77056

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JACKSON, JEFFREY CRAIG

2200 N. Loop We

Houston, TX 77018

 

Court Documents

Exhibit 05

11/19/2018: Exhibit 05

Exhibit 04

11/19/2018: Exhibit 04

Civil Case Information Sheet

11/19/2018: Civil Case Information Sheet

Plaintiff's Original Petition and Application for Ex-Parte Temporary Restraining Order and Temporary Injunction

11/19/2018: Plaintiff's Original Petition and Application for Ex-Parte Temporary Restraining Order and Temporary Injunction

Notice Of Lis Pendens

11/20/2018: Notice Of Lis Pendens

Proposed Temporary Restraining Order

11/20/2018: Proposed Temporary Restraining Order

Exhibit 12

11/20/2018: Exhibit 12

Exhibit 10

11/20/2018: Exhibit 10

Exhibit 09

11/20/2018: Exhibit 09

Exhibit 08

11/20/2018: Exhibit 08

Exhibit 07

11/20/2018: Exhibit 07

Exhibit 06

11/20/2018: Exhibit 06

Plaintiff's First Supplement To Its Original Petition And Application For Ex-Parte Temporary Restraining Order And Temporary Injunction

11/20/2018: Plaintiff's First Supplement To Its Original Petition And Application For Ex-Parte Temporary Restraining Order And Temporary Injunction

Notice of hearing on application for temporary injunction

11/21/2018: Notice of hearing on application for temporary injunction

Civil Process Request

11/26/2018: Civil Process Request

Civil Process Pick-Up Form

12/03/2018: Civil Process Pick-Up Form

Reporter's Record

12/11/2018: Reporter's Record

ORDER SETTING BOND SIGNED

12/12/2018: ORDER SETTING BOND SIGNED

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/12/2018
  • Description: MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER GRANTED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • Description: ORDER SIGNED SETTING HEARING; Order Signed: 12/12/2018;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • Description: APPEARANCE ON TEMPORARY INJ OR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORD;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • Description: ORDER SETTING BOND SIGNED; Order Signed: 12/12/2018;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • Description: ORDER SIGNED GRANTING TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER; Order Signed: 12/12/2018;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • Description: MTN FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER HEARD, NO RULING MADE;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • Description: APPEARANCE ON TEMPORARY INJ OR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORD;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • Description: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: JACKSON, JEFFREY CRAIG; Person Filing: ASTORIA RESIDENTIAL LLC;

    Read MoreRead Less