This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 07/25/2022 at 07:19:24 (UTC).

ARUNDINA LLC vs. COMPTON, BARBARA J (AKA BARBARA SCIMMONS COMPTON)

Case Summary

On 07/01/2022 ARUNDINA LLC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against COMPTON, BARBARA J AKA BARBARA SCIMMONS COMPTON. This case was filed in Harris County District Courthouse, Harris County District Courthouse located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL GOMEZ. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****9715

  • Filing Date:

    07/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

MICHAEL GOMEZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ARUNDINA LLC

Defendants

COMPTON, BARBARA J (AKA BARBARA SCIMMONS COMPTON)

Houston, TX 77033

OCCUPANT(S) OF THE PROPERTY

Houston, TX 77033

COMPTON, BARBARA SCIMMONS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FRAPPIER, JAMES AUSTIN

Defendant Attorney

MEDEARIS, DAVID MILLER

 

Court Documents

Citation by Certified & First Class Mail Expedited Order Proceeding (TRC 106, 736)

07/05/2022: Citation by Certified & First Class Mail Expedited Order Proceeding (TRC 106, 736)

Citation by Certified & First Class Mail Expedited Order Proceeding (TRC 106, 736)

07/05/2022: Citation by Certified & First Class Mail Expedited Order Proceeding (TRC 106, 736)

Application for an Expedited Order Under Rule 736 on a Home Equity Loan

07/01/2022: Application for an Expedited Order Under Rule 736 on a Home Equity Loan

Affidavit in Support of Petitioner's Application for an Expedited Order Under Rule 736

07/01/2022: Affidavit in Support of Petitioner's Application for an Expedited Order Under Rule 736

Civil Process Request

07/01/2022: Civil Process Request

Exhibit A

07/01/2022: Exhibit A

Exhibit B

07/01/2022: Exhibit B

Exhibit C

07/01/2022: Exhibit C

Exhibit D

07/01/2022: Exhibit D

Exhibit E

07/01/2022: Exhibit E

Respondents Original Answer and Plea of Payment

07/21/2022: Respondents Original Answer and Plea of Payment

Domestic Return Receipt

07/20/2022: Domestic Return Receipt

Domestic Return Receipt

07/15/2022: Domestic Return Receipt

Certified Mail Receipt

07/05/2022: Certified Mail Receipt

Certified Mail Receipt

07/05/2022: Certified Mail Receipt

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER; Filing Attorney: MEDEARIS, DAVID MILLER; Person Filing: COMPTON, BARBARA J (AKA BARBARA SCIMMONS COMPTON);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (CERTIFIED); Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Person: OCCUPANT(S) OF THE PROPERTY; Issued: 7/5/2022; Served: 7/5/2022; Tracking: 74023088; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (CERTIFIED); Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Person: COMPTON, BARBARA J (AKA BARBARA SCIMMONS COMPTON); Issued: 7/5/2022; Served: 7/5/2022; Tracking: 74023087; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: FRAPPIER, JAMES AUSTIN; Person Filing: ARUNDINA LLC;

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MEDEARIS, DAVID MILLER