This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 11/09/2020 at 07:24:21 (UTC).

ARREDONDO, ALFRED C vs. 3M COMPANY

Case Summary

On 02/05/2015 ARREDONDO, ALFRED C filed an Other lawsuit against 3M COMPANY. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is KRISTEN BRAUCHLE HAWKINS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****6717

  • Filing Date:

    02/05/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

KRISTEN BRAUCHLE HAWKINS

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ARREDONDO, ALFRED C

ANZULADA, ALBERT JR

BROOKS, MICHAEL

HORLKA, GEORGE L

JOHNSON, DALE L

LEITA, LEON

MATULA, EDWARD E

MATULA, JULIUS M

MEJIA, DOMINGO R

SALAZAR, NICK

SEPEDA, FRANK V

VALDEZ, RAYMOND G

VARGAS, ALEJANDRO A

WOODS, JOHN H

Defendants

3M COMPANY

4520 CORP INC

AJAX BOILER INC

ALCOA INC

AMETECK INC

AMOCO CHEMICAL COMPANY

62 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CANNON SHANKS, KAREN

Other Attorneys

LOWERY, JAMES A. III

 

Court Documents

Exhibit C

02/05/2015: Exhibit C

Exhibit B

02/05/2015: Exhibit B

Exhibit A

02/05/2015: Exhibit A

Notice of Transfer Under Rule 13 of Tag-Along Case

02/05/2015: Notice of Transfer Under Rule 13 of Tag-Along Case

notice

02/19/2015: notice

Return to Sender-Envelope

02/19/2015: Return to Sender-Envelope

Notice of Designation of Attorney in Charge

04/23/2015: Notice of Designation of Attorney in Charge

PARTIES ADMIN CLOSED BY COURT

07/06/2015: PARTIES ADMIN CLOSED BY COURT

PARTIES ADMIN CLOSED BY COURT

07/06/2015: PARTIES ADMIN CLOSED BY COURT

PARTIES ADMIN CLOSED BY COURT

07/06/2015: PARTIES ADMIN CLOSED BY COURT

PARTIES ADMIN CLOSED BY COURT

07/06/2015: PARTIES ADMIN CLOSED BY COURT

PARTIES ADMIN CLOSED BY COURT

07/06/2015: PARTIES ADMIN CLOSED BY COURT

PARTIES ADMIN CLOSED BY COURT

07/06/2015: PARTIES ADMIN CLOSED BY COURT

PARTIES ADMIN CLOSED BY COURT

07/06/2015: PARTIES ADMIN CLOSED BY COURT

PARTIES ADMIN CLOSED BY COURT

07/06/2015: PARTIES ADMIN CLOSED BY COURT

PARTIES ADMIN CLOSED BY COURT

07/06/2015: PARTIES ADMIN CLOSED BY COURT

PARTIES ADMIN CLOSED BY COURT

07/06/2015: PARTIES ADMIN CLOSED BY COURT

PARTIES ADMIN CLOSED BY COURT

07/06/2015: PARTIES ADMIN CLOSED BY COURT

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/11/2015
  • DocketDescription: PARTIES ADMIN CLOSED BY COURT; Order Signed: 12/11/2015;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2015
  • DocketDescription: PARTIES ADMIN CLOSED BY COURT; Order Signed: 7/6/2015;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2015
  • DocketDescription: PARTIES ADMIN CLOSED BY COURT; Order Signed: 7/6/2015;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2015
  • DocketDescription: PARTIES ADMIN CLOSED BY COURT; Order Signed: 7/6/2015;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2015
  • DocketDescription: PARTIES ADMIN CLOSED BY COURT; Order Signed: 7/6/2015;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2015
  • DocketDescription: PARTIES ADMIN CLOSED BY COURT; Order Signed: 7/6/2015;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2015
  • DocketDescription: PARTIES ADMIN CLOSED BY COURT; Order Signed: 7/6/2015;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2015
  • DocketDescription: PARTIES ADMIN CLOSED BY COURT; Order Signed: 7/6/2015;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2015
  • DocketDescription: PARTIES ADMIN CLOSED BY COURT; Order Signed: 7/6/2015;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2015
  • DocketDescription: PARTIES ADMIN CLOSED BY COURT; Order Signed: 7/6/2015;

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 02/05/2015
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: CANNON SHANKS, KAREN; Person Filing: ARREDONDO, ALFRED C;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2015
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: CANNON SHANKS, KAREN; Person Filing: MEJIA, DOMINGO R;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2015
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: CANNON SHANKS, KAREN; Person Filing: SALAZAR, NICK;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2015
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: CANNON SHANKS, KAREN; Person Filing: ANZULADA, ALBERT JR;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2015
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: CANNON SHANKS, KAREN; Person Filing: LEITA, LEON;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2015
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: CANNON SHANKS, KAREN; Person Filing: MATULA, EDWARD E;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2015
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: CANNON SHANKS, KAREN; Person Filing: MATULA, JULIUS M;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2015
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: CANNON SHANKS, KAREN; Person Filing: BROOKS, MICHAEL;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2015
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: CANNON SHANKS, KAREN; Person Filing: HORELKA, GEORGE L;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2015
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: CANNON SHANKS, KAREN; Person Filing: JOHNSON, DALE L;

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AJAX BOILER INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where ALCOA INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Blount International Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where BP Amoco Chemical Company is a litigant