This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 09/29/2022 at 04:31:27 (UTC).

ARMSTRONG, TERRY vs. ARKEMA INC (F/K/A PENNWALT CORPORATION AND ELF ATOCHEM NORTH AMERICA

Case Summary

On 06/29/2022 ARMSTRONG, TERRY filed an Other lawsuit against ARKEMA INC F/K/A PENNWALT CORPORATION AND ELF ATOCHEM NORTH AMERICA. This case was filed in Harris County District Courthouse, Harris County District Courthouse located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is KRISTEN BRAUCHLE HAWKINS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****8902

  • Filing Date:

    06/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

KRISTEN BRAUCHLE HAWKINS

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ARMSTRONG, TERRY

ARMSTRONG, KATHERINE

Cross Defendants and Defendants

ARKEMA INC (F/K/A PENNWALT CORPORATION AND ELF ATOCHEM NORTH AMERICA

AVCO CORPORATION (SUED INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO

AVENTIS INC (FOR ITS DESENEX LINE OF PRODUCTS)

AVON PRODUCTS INC

BARRETTS MINERALS INC

BASF CATALYSTS LLC (SUED INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO

BLOCK DRUG CORPORATION (SUED INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-

BRENNTAG NORTH AMERICA INC (SUED INDIVIDUALLY AND AS

BRENNTAG SPECIALTIES LLC (F/K/A BRENNTAG SPECIALTIES INC F/K/A

CHATTEM INC (A SUBSIDIARY OF SANOFIA VENTIS U S LLC (SUED

COTY INC

CROWN LABORATORIES INC (FOR ITS DESENEX LINE OF PRODUCTS)

DCO LLC (F/K/A DANA COMPANIES LLC)(SUED INDIVIDUALLY AND AS

DUREZ CORPORATION

EASTERN MAGNESIA TALC COMPANY

FEDERAL-MOGUL ASBESTOS PERSONAL INJURY TRUST (AS SUCCESSOR TO

FISONS CORPORATION (FOR ITS DESENEX LINE OF PRODUCTS)

FORD MOTOR COMPANY (SUED INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

AVCO CORPORATION (SUED INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO

154 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PETERSON, HOLLY CHRISTINE

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

HENDRYX, MICHAEL

LOWERY, JAMES A. III

ELLISTON, GARY D.

SPARDONE, STEPHANIE L.

FRAZIER, MARY ELIZONDO

JACOBS, KEVIN THOMAS

WILKES, FORREST REN

LEDYARD, DAVID W.

WRIGHT, DAWN MARIE

Other Attorneys

RHODES, KENNETH D.

NIKOLOPOULOS, ANTHREA

KEITH, JILLIAN VAN RENSBURG

HOFFMAN BRUCE, STACY

FOLEY, KEITH WILLIAM

SMITH, MICHELE YENNIE

RANDEL, REED CULLEN

MILTENBERGER, LEWIS C.

HARRIS, RAYMOND PAUL JR.

MCLAIN, MATTHEW THOMAS

9 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

Return Mail Undeliverable

09/20/2022: Return Mail Undeliverable

Return Mail Undeliverable

09/20/2022: Return Mail Undeliverable

Return Mail Undeliverable

09/20/2022: Return Mail Undeliverable

Return Mail Undeliverable

09/20/2022: Return Mail Undeliverable

NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

07/28/2022: NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

DEFENDANT FEDERAL-MOGUL ASBESTOS PERSONAL INJURY TRUST AS SUCCESSOR TO FELT PRODUCTS MANUFACTURING COMPANYS MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE AND, SUBJECT THERETO, ITS ORIGINAL ANSWER

08/19/2022: DEFENDANT FEDERAL-MOGUL ASBESTOS PERSONAL INJURY TRUST AS SUCCESSOR TO FELT PRODUCTS MANUFACTURING COMPANYS MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE AND, SUBJECT THERETO, ITS ORIGINAL ANSWER

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF DEFENDANT RAYTHEON COMPANY

08/22/2022: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF DEFENDANT RAYTHEON COMPANY

JURY DEMAND

08/22/2022: JURY DEMAND

DEFENDANT, DUREZ CORPORATIONS ORIGINAL ANSWER

08/22/2022: DEFENDANT, DUREZ CORPORATIONS ORIGINAL ANSWER

Exhibit Affidavit of Mary Olohan

08/24/2022: Exhibit Affidavit of Mary Olohan

Special Appearance of Defendant Hollingsworth & Vose Company

08/24/2022: Special Appearance of Defendant Hollingsworth & Vose Company

Civil Process Request_Armstrong

08/25/2022: Civil Process Request_Armstrong

1st Amended Petition_Armstrong

08/25/2022: 1st Amended Petition_Armstrong

PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF INTENTION TO ELECT FAST TRACK STATUS

08/26/2022: PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF INTENTION TO ELECT FAST TRACK STATUS

NOTICE OF ADOPTION OF PLEADINGS AND DISCOVERY RESPONSES FILED IN THE IN RE: MDL ASBESTOS LITIGATION: CAUSE NO. 2004-03964

08/29/2022: NOTICE OF ADOPTION OF PLEADINGS AND DISCOVERY RESPONSES FILED IN THE IN RE: MDL ASBESTOS LITIGATION: CAUSE NO. 2004-03964

FORD MOTOR COMPANY NOTICE OF RELIANCE ON ITS IN RE TEXAS MDL DISCOVERY RESPONSES

08/31/2022: FORD MOTOR COMPANY NOTICE OF RELIANCE ON ITS IN RE TEXAS MDL DISCOVERY RESPONSES

CITATION TRACKING #74044373 - LG ELECTRONICS U S A INC

09/02/2022: CITATION TRACKING #74044373 - LG ELECTRONICS U S A INC

NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

09/06/2022: NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

74 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/09/2022
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: MILTENBERGER, LEWIS C.; Person Filing: NOVARTIS CORPORATION (SUED INDIVIDUALLY AND AS A SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketDescription: NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162); Order Signed: 9/6/2022;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: LG ELECTRONICS U S A INC (SUED INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-; Issued: 8/26/2022; Served: 8/29/2022; Received: 9/2/2022; Tracking: 74044373; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • DocketDescription: FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: PETERSON, HOLLY CHRISTINE; Person Filing: ARMSTRONG, TERRY;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • DocketDescription: FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: PETERSON, HOLLY CHRISTINE; Person Filing: ARMSTRONG, KATHERINE;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: LEDYARD, DAVID W.; Person Filing: DUREZ CORPORATION;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER; Filing Attorney: COX, MARYALYCE W.; Person Filing: RAYTHEON COMPANY;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: SIMEK, DOUGLAS RICHARD; Person Filing: FEDERAL-MOGUL ASBESTOS PERSONAL INJURY TRUST (AS SUCCESSOR TO;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: ELLISTON, GARY D.; Person Filing: FISONS CORPORATION (FOR ITS DESENEX LINE OF PRODUCTS);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: SMITH, MICHELE YENNIE; Person Filing: SONY CORPORATION OF AMERICA;

    Read MoreRead Less
59 More Docket Entries
  • 07/15/2022
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: LEDYARD, DAVID W.; Person Filing: OCCIDENTAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION (F/K/A HOOKERS CHEMICAL CO);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • DocketDescription: JURY DEMAND MADE (TRCP 216);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER; Filing Attorney: WILKES, FORREST REN; Person Filing: EASTERN MAGNESIA TALC COMPANY;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: HOFFMAN BRUCE, STACY; Person Filing: WALMART INC.S;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER; Filing Attorney: HENDRYX, MICHAEL; Person Filing: ARKEMA INC (F/K/A PENNWALT CORPORATION AND ELF ATOCHEM NORTH AMERICA;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: RHODES, KENNETH D.; Person Filing: METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: ELLISTON, GARY D.; Person Filing: GLAXOSMITHKLINE LLC (SUED INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: PETERSON, HOLLY CHRISTINE; Person Filing: ARMSTRONG, KATHERINE;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: PETERSON, HOLLY CHRISTINE; Person Filing: ARMSTRONG, TERRY;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • DocketDescription: REFERRED TO PRE-TRIAL COURT;

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AVON PRODUCTS, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where FISONS CORPORATION is a litigant