Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 06/19/2015 at 23:48:24 (UTC).

ARCENEAUX, ELOISE (IND AND AS REPRESENTATIVE OF TH vs. UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 12/03/2004 ARCENEAUX, ELOISE IND AND AS REPRESENTATIVE OF TH filed an Other - Complex Tort/Class Action lawsuit against UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****8629

  • Filing Date:

    12/03/2004

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Complex Tort/Class Action

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Defendants

ARCENEAUX, ELOISE (IND AND AS REPRESENTATIVE OF THE ESTATE OF CLARENCE

CROWN CORK & SEAL CO INC (IND AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO MUNDET

GEORGIA PACIFIC CORPORATION

KELLY-MOORE PAINT COMPANY INC (IND AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO

METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY (CORPORATION)

ARCENEAUX, DANNY K

THOMAS, POLLY

ARCENEAUX, VICTOR

ASARCO INCORPORATED

GREENE TWEED & COMPANY INC

UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION

ABLE SUPPLY CO (CORPORATION)

AMERICAN PREMIER INC (IND AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO PREMIER

AMETEK INC (IND AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO HAVEG CORPORATION)

ANCHOR PACKING COMPANY (CORPORATION)

ASARCO INC (FKA AMERICAN SMELTING & REFINING CO) (NEW JERSEY

AMERICAN SMELTING & REFINING CO

AQUA-CHEM INC (DBA CLEAVER BROOKS DIVISION)

CLEAVER-BROOKS DIVISION

BEAZER EAST INC (IND AND AS SUCCESSOR TO THIEM CORPORATION KOPPERS

73 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

KHERKHER, STEVEN JOSEPH

STUART, KIMBERLY ROSE

GALLAGHER, KEVIN P

GALLAGHER, KEVIN PATRICK

WADE, TODD N.

RHODES, KENNETH D.

LACKEY, DOUG

KEITH, VICTORIA LEIGH OTT

ALMQUIST, ARTHUR RAY

YATES, STACY K.

POWELL, LISA A.

ELLISTON, GARY D.

WHITE, CLAY M.

Other Attorneys

NEWMAN, DEBORAH A.

DALTON, D. PAUL

FOLEY, KEITH WILLIAM

KINSEL, J. FRANK JR.

FRASE, LAURA ANN

BALDO, NICHOLAS S.

BLAKENEY, MICHAEL LADON

14 More Attorneys Available

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/03/2014
  • NO COSTS ALLOCATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2014
  • ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED BY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2013
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2009
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2009
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2009
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2009
  • ORDER FOR INTERLOCUTORY SUMMARY JUDGMENT SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2009
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2009
  • FIRST AMENDED ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - KINSEL, J. FRANK JR. Person Filing - HENRY VOGT MACHINE CO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2009
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
139 More Docket Entries
  • 03/08/2005
  • JURY DEMAND MADE (TRCP 216)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2005
  • JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - FUNDERBURK, LARRY B. Person Filing - MUNDY INDUSTRIAL MAINTENANCE INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - VOLMERT, ELIZABETH PAINTER Person Filing - KVAERNER US INC., AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO DAVY MCKEE CORPORATION,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - POWERS, JAMES H. Person Filing - UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2004
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - KHERKHER, STEVEN JOSEPH Person Filing - ARCENEAUX, VICTOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2004
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - KHERKHER, STEVEN JOSEPH Person Filing - THOMAS, POLLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2004
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - KHERKHER, STEVEN JOSEPH Person Filing - ARCENEAUX, DANNY K

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2004
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - KHERKHER, STEVEN JOSEPH Person Filing - ARCENEAUX, ELOISE (IND AND AS REPRESENTATIVE OF THE ESTATE OF CLARENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2004
  • JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ANCHOR PACKING COMPANY (THE) is a litigant

Latest cases where ASARCO LLC. SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO ASARCO, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where ABLE SUPPLY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where GREENE TWEED & CO INC is a litigant