This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 07/06/2015 at 00:23:18 (UTC).

ARAIZA, JUAN vs. AIR LIQUIDE AMERICA CORP

Case Summary

On 01/05/2005 ARAIZA, JUAN filed an Other - Complex Tort/Class Action lawsuit against AIR LIQUIDE AMERICA CORP. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0692

  • Filing Date:

    01/05/2005

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Complex Tort/Class Action

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Defendants

ARAIZA, JUAN

AIR LIQUIDE AMERICA CORP

AMERICAN COLLOID COMPANY

SCHMIDT MANUFACTURING INC

E D BULLARD COMPANY

ENCON SAFETY PRODUCTS INC

VALLEN CORPORATION

FLEXO PRODUCTS INC

HANSON AGGREGATES CENTRAL INC (FKA PIONEER CONRETE OF TEXAS INC)

JEBCO ABRASIVES INC

LONE STAR INDUSTRIES INC

3M COMPANY (FKA MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY)

MINE SAFETY APPLIANCES COMPANY

PULMOSAN SAFETY EQUIPMENT CORPORATION

PANGBORN CORP

SCOTT TECHNOLOGIES

THORSTENBERG MATERIALS COMPANY, INC.

MARTINDALE ELECTRIC COMPANY

RANSBURG CORPORATION

INGERSOLL-RAND COMPANY

79 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

MARTIN, KIRK E.

DOLEZAL, JOHN R.

OXFORD, HUBERT III

ANDERSON, ROGER WILLIAM

ORETSKY, ANDREW S.

WELLS, PETER BOYD III

JOHNSON, EDWARD WESLEY

TAYLOR, THOMAS B.

MARTINEZ, PATRICK MICHAEL

KACAL, GEORGE JEROME JR.

PHILLIPS, CLINTON EUGENE

WARE, JAMES L.

Other Attorneys

COFFEY, WILLIAM B. JR.

ELLINGTON, OWEN H.

DAWSON, CARL RAPIER

SHAVER, JEFFERY J

HOSSLEY, DANIEL ALLEN

MARTINSON, DON DAVID

TAYLOR, DAVID M.

HOLMES, PAUL JOSEPH

22 More Attorneys Available

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/04/2010
  • ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO ANOTHER DISTRICT COURT SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2010
  • TRANSFERRED TO ANOTHER HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2010
  • TRANSFERRED TO HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2008
  • ORDER SIGNED SUBSTITUTING ATTORNEY OF RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2008
  • ORDER SIGNED SUBSTITUTING ATTORNEY OF RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2007
  • ORDER SIGNED SUBSTITUTING ATTORNEY OF RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2006
  • PARTIAL DISMISSAL ON AGREEMENT OF PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2006
  • PARTIAL DISMISSAL ON AGREEMENT OF PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2006
  • ORDER FOR AGREED PARTIAL JUDGMENT SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2006
  • ANSWER FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - MCALISTER, CATHY LEA Person Filing - EMPIRE ABRASIVE EQUIPMENT COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
149 More Docket Entries
  • 02/04/2005
  • ANSWER FIRST AMENDED PETITION : Filing Attorney - JOHNSON, EDWARD WESLEY Person Filing - FLEXO PRODUCTS INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2005
  • CROSS ACTION : Filing Attorney - ANDERSON, ROGER WILLIAM Person Filing - AMERICAN COLLOID COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2005
  • CROSS ACTION : Filing Attorney - DOLEZAL, JOHN R. Person Filing - MARTINDALE ELECTRIC COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2005
  • CROSS ACTION : Filing Attorney - DAWSON, CARL RAPIER Person Filing - SCOTT TECHNOLOGIES INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2005
  • CROSS ACTION : Filing Attorney - DAWSON, CARL RAPIER Person Filing - SCOTT TECHNOLOGIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2005
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - HOSSLEY, DANIEL ALLEN Person Filing - BURGESS, GERALD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2005
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - HOSSLEY, DANIEL ALLEN Person Filing - BRADLEY, BILLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2005
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - HOSSLEY, DANIEL ALLEN Person Filing - MAHOMES, CURTIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2005
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - HOSSLEY, DANIEL ALLEN Person Filing - COBB, KENNETH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2005
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - HOSSLEY, DANIEL ALLEN Person Filing - ARAIZA, JUAN

    Read MoreRead Less