This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 10/08/2022 at 07:38:52 (UTC).

ARAB, FATEMEH vs. HAMDI, HASIB

Case Summary

On 09/14/2022 ARAB, FATEMEH filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against HAMDI, HASIB. This case was filed in Harris County District Courthouse, Harris County District Courthouse located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is SCOT DOLLINGER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****8841

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

SCOT DOLLINGER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ARAB, FATEMEH

Defendant

HAMDI, HASIB

Houston, TX 77079

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PAPAPAVLOU, JOHN

 

Court Documents

Plaintiffs Original Petition

09/14/2022: Plaintiffs Original Petition

Request for Issuance of Service

09/14/2022: Request for Issuance of Service

Citation

09/28/2022: Citation

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/14/2022
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HAMDI, HASIB; Issued: 9/16/2022; Served: 9/28/2022; Tracking: 74052561; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: PAPAPAVLOU, JOHN; Person Filing: ARAB, FATEMEH;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer PAPAPAVLOU, JOHN