Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 07/17/2015 at 09:46:50 (UTC).

ANTHONY, DORIS vs. A W CHESTERTON

Case Summary

On 07/15/2005 ANTHONY, DORIS filed an Other - Complex Tort/Class Action lawsuit against A W CHESTERTON. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******733C

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2005

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Complex Tort/Class Action

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ANTHONY, DORIS

Defendants

A W CHESTERTON

ABLE SUPPLY COMPANY

ADVANCE THERMAL HYDRONICS INC (FKA THE HYDROTHERM CORPORATION)

THE HYDROTHERM CORPORATION

AJAX BOILER & HEATER CO

AJAX BOILER INC

AK STEEL CORPORATION (FKA ARMCO INC)

ARMCO INC

ALBANY INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION

ALCOA WORLD ALUMINA

ALCOA INC

ALLIED CHEMICAL CORPORATION

ALLIED SIGNAL

ALLIS-CHALMERS CORPORATION PRODUCT LIABILITY TRUST

AMERICAN CYNAMID COMPANY

AMERICAN STANDARD INC

AMETEK INC

AMOCO CHEMICAL COMPANY

AMOCO CORPORATION AMOCO PRODUCTION COMPANY

258 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

COON, BRENT WAYNE

Defendant Attorneys

HUEBER, SUSAN JAN

THACKSTON, ROBERT EDWIN

Other Attorneys

DE LOS SANTOS, EDDY L. JR.

CLARY, BRIAN S.

LABOON, JOHN ANDREW

HOGAN, TIMOTHY J.

HORNE, NATHAN RAY

PIPKIN, JOHN EMORY

HUNTER, HAROLD HARVEY

HARTMAN, ANDREW STUART

SLAUGHTER, EDWARD MORRIS

RICE, B. STEVE

HAZEN, SCOTT PAUL

JONES, D. ALLAN

ROBBINS, LAUREN MILLER

TIDWELL, JOHN L.

FRASE, LAURA ANN

ANDARSIO, PEDRO F

WATERS, MARCUS WAYNE

1 More Attorneys Available

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/08/2014
  • ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED BY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2014
  • NO COSTS ALLOCATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2013
  • PARTIAL REMOVAL TO BANKRUPTCY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2013
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2013
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2012
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2012
  • PARTIAL DISMISSAL ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2011
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2011
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2010
  • ANSWER : Filing Attorney - PIPKIN, JOHN EMORY Person Filing - DIXIE CHEMICAL COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 04/11/2008
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2008
  • ORDER SIGNED SUBSTITUTING ATTORNEY OF RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2007
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2007
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2006
  • ORDER SIGNED SUBSTITUTING ATTORNEY OF RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2006
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - CLARY, BRIAN S. Person Filing - BIRD INCORPORATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2006
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - LIVINGSTON, DAVID A. Person Filing - DARCO SOUTHERN INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2006
  • AMENDED ANSWER FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - MONTGOMERY, PAMELA W. Person Filing - MONTELLO INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2006
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2005
  • SEVERANCE : Filing Attorney - COON, BRENT WAYNE Person Filing - ANTHONY, DORIS

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ARMCO INC is a litigant

Latest cases where ADVANCE THERMAL HYDRONICS INC (FKA THE HYDROTHERM CORPORATION) is a litigant

Latest cases where ALLIED CHEMICAL CORP is a litigant