This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 07/06/2015 at 00:23:34 (UTC).

ANGTON, ANTHONY vs. AIR LIQUIDE AMERICAN CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 01/05/2005 ANGTON, ANTHONY filed an Other - Complex Tort/Class Action lawsuit against AIR LIQUIDE AMERICAN CORPORATION. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0693

  • Filing Date:

    01/05/2005

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Complex Tort/Class Action

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Defendants

ANGTON, ANTHONY

AMERICAN COLLOID COMPANY

SCHMIDT MANUFACTURING INC

E D BULLARD COMPANY

FLEXO PRODUCTS INC

PIONEER CONCRETE OF TEXAS INC

JEBCO ABRASIVES INC

JOHN BARTEN (IND AND DBA JOHN BARTEN COMPANY)

JOHN BARTEN COMPANY

J B INDUSTRIAL SAND

3M COMPANY (FKA MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY)

MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY

PALO ALTON SILICA SAND INC

MINE SAFETY APPLIANCES COMPANY

PAULI & GRIFFIN COMPANY

BRIGGS WEAVER INC

SPECIALTY SAND COMPANY

PULMOSAN SAFETY EQUIPMENT CORPORATION

INGERSOLL-RAND COMPANY

RANSBURG CORPORATION

72 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

MARTIN, KIRK E.

ANDERSON, ROGER WILLIAM

ORETSKY, ANDREW S.

BRYANT, STEVE A.

JOHNSON, EDWARD WESLEY

TAYLOR, THOMAS B.

MARTINEZ, PATRICK MICHAEL

WEBB, WILLIAM CURTIS

ELLINGTON, OWEN H.

HANCOCK, RONALD T.

GEER, EVA D.

PAPPAS, GEORGE P.

COFFEY, WILLIAM B. JR.

PHILLIPS, CLINTON EUGENE

PARSONS, JOHN PHILIP

WALZEL, MICHAEL RAY

Other Attorneys

DOLEZAL, JOHN R.

MANNING, JACK B.

PYLE, MICHAEL

HENNESSY, EDWARD J.

22 More Attorneys Available

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/04/2010
  • ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO ANOTHER DISTRICT COURT SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2010
  • TRANSFERRED TO ANOTHER HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2010
  • TRANSFERRED TO HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2008
  • ORDER SIGNED SUBSTITUTING ATTORNEY OF RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2007
  • ORDER SIGNED SUBSTITUTING ATTORNEY OF RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2006
  • PARTIAL DISMISSAL ON AGREEMENT OF PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2006
  • ORDER OF PARTIAL NONSUIT SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2006
  • PARTIAL DISMISSAL ON AGREEMENT OF PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2006
  • ORDER FOR AGREED PARTIAL JUDGMENT SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2006
  • ANSWER SECOND AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - MCALISTER, CATHY LEA Person Filing - EMPIRE ABRASIVE EQUIPMENT COMPANY L P (ERRONEOUSLY NAMED AS EMPIRE

    Read MoreRead Less
168 More Docket Entries
  • 02/04/2005
  • CROSS ACTION : Filing Attorney - DOLEZAL, JOHN R. Person Filing - MARTINDALE ELECTRIC COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2005
  • CROSS ACTION : Filing Attorney - MANNING, JACK B. Person Filing - BACOU-DALLOZ SAFETY, INC. F/K/A WGM SAFETY CORPORATION D/B/A WILSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2005
  • CROSS ACTION : Filing Attorney - JOHNSON, EDWARD WESLEY Person Filing - FLEXO PRODUCTS INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2005
  • CROSS ACTION : Filing Attorney - HANCOCK, RONALD T. Person Filing - MINE SAFETY APPLIANCES COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2005
  • CROSS ACTION : Filing Attorney - HENNESSY, EDWARD J. Person Filing - THORSTENBERG MATERIALS COMPANY, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - LAYMAN, DAVID M. Person Filing - EMPIRE ABRASIVE EQUIPMENT COMPANY L P (ERRONEOUSLY NAMED AS EMPIRE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2005
  • ANSWER ALL CROSS ACTION : Filing Attorney - LAYMAN, DAVID M. Person Filing - EMPIRE ABRASIVE EQUIPMENT COMPANY L P (ERRONEOUSLY NAMED AS EMPIRE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2005
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - GEER, EVA D. Person Filing - ANGTON, ANTHONY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2005
  • CROSS ACTION : Filing Attorney - LAYMAN, DAVID M. Person Filing - EMPIRE ABRASIVE EQUIPMENT COMPANY L P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2005
  • CROSS ACTION : Filing Attorney - BRYANT, STEVE A. Person Filing - E D BULLARD COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less