Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 05/11/2021 at 18:08:27 (UTC).

ANGLIN, RONALD W (SR) vs. BOB SCHMIDT INC

Case Summary

On 04/12/2016 ANGLIN, RONALD W SR filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against BOB SCHMIDT INC. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judges overseeing this case are DARYL L. MOORE and BRITTANYE MORRIS. The case status is Pending - Trial.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****3149

  • Filing Date:

    04/12/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Trial

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judges

DARYL L. MOORE

BRITTANYE MORRIS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ANGLIN, RONALD W (SR)

Port Arthur, TX 77642

Defendants

SCHMIDT MANUFACTURING COMPANY

E D BULLARD COMPANY

G-BLAST SERVICE & SUPPLY INC (A FOREIGN CORPORATION)

MINE SAFETY APPLIANCES COMPANY LLC

LONE STAR INDUSTRIES INC

SPECIALTY SAND COMPANY

CLEMCO INDUSTRIES INC

MARCO GROUP INTERNATIONAL INC

ABRASIVE PRODUCTS AND EUIPMENT INC (A FOREIGN CORPORATION)

BOB SCHMIDT INC

ABRASIVE PRODUCTS AND EQUIPMENT

LONE STAR INDUSTRIES, INC

Others

G-BLAST SERVICE & SUPPLY INC (A FOREIGN CORPORATION) MAY BE SERVED BY

1180 Laurel St

Beaumont, TX 77701

ABRASIVE PRODUCTS AND EUIPMENT INC (A FOREIGN CORPORATION) MAY BE

1999 Bryan St Suite 900

Dallas, TX 75201

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BRADLEY, LANCE P.

3120 Central Ma

Portarthur, TX 77642

Defendant Attorneys

MCHALE, THOMAS

9595 Suite 8210

The Woodla, TX 77380

WILKERSON, WILLIAM MARCUS

REYNARD, DAVID D. JR.

Po Box 7486

Beaumont, TX 77726

WARE, JAMES L.

909 Fannin Sui

Houston, TX 77010

GARNER, SHARON MARIE

4900 Woodway Dr

Houston, TX 77056

LONG, JOHN DANIEL

2727 Allen Park

Houston, TX 77019

 

Court Documents

Exhibit A

01/25/2017: Exhibit A

Notice of Intention to take Deposition by Written Questions

03/06/2017: Notice of Intention to take Deposition by Written Questions

Notice Of Delivery

04/24/2017: Notice Of Delivery

Notice Of Delivery

04/24/2017: Notice Of Delivery

Notice Of Delivery

04/24/2017: Notice Of Delivery

NOTICE OF DELIVERY

05/08/2017: NOTICE OF DELIVERY

NOTICE OF DELIVERY

06/07/2017: NOTICE OF DELIVERY

NOTICE OF DELIVERY

06/07/2017: NOTICE OF DELIVERY

NOTICE OF DELIVERY

06/07/2017: NOTICE OF DELIVERY

NOTICE OF DELIVERY

06/07/2017: NOTICE OF DELIVERY

Certification and Notice of Delivery

11/29/2018: Certification and Notice of Delivery

Certification and Notice of Delivery

11/29/2018: Certification and Notice of Delivery

Notice of activity

12/04/2018: Notice of activity

Certification and Notice of Delivery

01/23/2019: Certification and Notice of Delivery

Certification and Notice of Delivery

02/08/2019: Certification and Notice of Delivery

Certified Mail Receipt

07/07/2016: Certified Mail Receipt

Certified Mail Receipt

07/07/2016: Certified Mail Receipt

Original Answer of Abrasive Products and Equipment, Inc.

09/23/2016: Original Answer of Abrasive Products and Equipment, Inc.

195 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/24/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORDER SIGNED DESIGNATING CASE TRIAL READY; Order Signed: 8/24/2020;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORDER SIGNED GRANTING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE; Order Signed: 8/24/2020;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORDER SIGNED GRANTING TRIAL REQUEST; Order Signed: 8/24/2020;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORDER OF PARTIAL NONSUIT SIGNED; Order Signed: 7/30/2020;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORDER OF PARTIAL NONSUIT SIGNED; Order Signed: 7/22/2020;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • DocketDescription: NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162); Order Signed: 6/30/2020;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • DocketDescription: PARTIAL DISMISSAL ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION; Order Signed: 6/19/2020;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORDER SIGNED DESIGNATING CASE TRIAL READY; Order Signed: 5/13/2020;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORDER SIGNED GRANTING TRIAL REQUEST; Order Signed: 5/13/2020;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORDER SIGNED GRANTING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE; Order Signed: 5/13/2020;

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 09/23/2016
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: LONG, JOHN DANIEL; Person Filing: ABRASIVE PRODUCTS AND EUIPMENT INC (A FOREIGN CORPORATION);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2016
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION CORPORATE; Status: SERVICE RETURNED; Instrument: AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: G-BLAST SERVICE & SUPPLY INC (A FOREIGN CORPORATION) MAY BE SERVED BY; Issued: 8/25/2016; Served: 8/30/2016; Returned: 9/13/2016; Tracking: 73281261; Deliver To: MAIL TO ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2016
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION CORPORATE; Status: SERVICE RETURNED; Instrument: AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: ABRASIVE PRODUCTS AND EUIPMENT INC (A FOREIGN CORPORATION) MAY BE; Issued: 8/25/2016; Served: 9/1/2016; Returned: 9/13/2016; Tracking: 73281196; Deliver To: MAIL TO ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2016
  • DocketDescription: FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: BRADLEY, LANCE P.; Person Filing: ANGLIN, RONALD W (SR);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2016
  • DocketDescription: ORDER SIGNED GRANTING ENTRY OF TEMPORARY ORDERS; Order Signed: 8/4/2016;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2016
  • DocketDescription: DESIGNATED TRIAL READY;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2016
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: GARNER, SHARON MARIE; Person Filing: CLEMCO INDUSTRIES INC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2016
  • DocketDescription: TRANSFERRED TO ANOTHER HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT COURT;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2016
  • DocketDescription: TRANSFERRED TO HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT COURT;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2016
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: BRADLEY, LANCE P.; Person Filing: ANGLIN, RONALD W (SR);

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Marco Group International, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where MINE SAFETY APPLIANCES CO is a litigant

Latest cases where SCHMIDT MANUFACTURING INC is a litigant

Latest cases where SPECIALTY SAND COMPANY is a litigant