This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 06/18/2015 at 23:30:32 (UTC).

ANDERSON, WILLIAM TED vs. TRIPLEX INC

Case Summary

On 12/02/2004 ANDERSON, WILLIAM TED filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against TRIPLEX INC. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****3679

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2004

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ANDERSON, WILLIAM TED

ANDERSON, ROLAND

ANGTON, JAMES I

ARMENDARIZ, ARTURO S

ASHWORTH, VIRGIL

BAILEY, CHESTER L

HADLEY, LOUIS

HAGLER, JOANN

HARE, ALTON E

HARRELL, GLENN

HAWKINS, BILLIE JOE

HENDERSON, EDWARD

HENRY, JOHN B

HOBBS, DAVID V

HOCKLESS, PERRY SR

BELCHER, JOHN TAYLOR

BELL, OSCAR L JR

BELL, ARTHUR JR

BELLARD, EWELL

BIERSDORFER, MARVIN

168 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WALKER, ERIK

Other Attorneys

LAFFERTY, LADD M.

BARRON, BARBARA JANE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/17/2006
  • EACH PAY OWN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2006
  • ORDER OF NON-SUIT SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2005
  • DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2005
  • DESIGNATED TRIAL READY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - BARRON, BARBARA JANE Person Filing - TRIPLEX INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2005
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - WALKER, ERIK Person Filing - ROGERS, JAMES R

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2005
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - WALKER, ERIK Person Filing - ROGERS, JERRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2005
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - WALKER, ERIK Person Filing - RODRIGUEZ, JESSE C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2005
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - WALKER, ERIK Person Filing - HENRY, JOHN B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2005
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - WALKER, ERIK Person Filing - RISINGER, AMOS W

    Read MoreRead Less
175 More Docket Entries
  • 01/28/2005
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - WALKER, ERIK Person Filing - CHAPA, MIGUEL Y

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2005
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - WALKER, ERIK Person Filing - CAIN, LEWIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2005
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - WALKER, ERIK Person Filing - CHANCE, JAMES HUELON JR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2005
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - WALKER, ERIK Person Filing - CHISOM, PAUL C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2004
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - WALKER, ERIK Person Filing - ARMENDARIZ, ARTURO S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2004
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - WALKER, ERIK Person Filing - ASHWORTH, VIRGIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2004
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - WALKER, ERIK Person Filing - BAILEY, CHESTER L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2004
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - WALKER, ERIK Person Filing - ANGTON, JAMES I

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2004
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - WALKER, ERIK Person Filing - ANDERSON, WILLIAM TED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2004
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - WALKER, ERIK Person Filing - ANDERSON, ROLAND

    Read MoreRead Less