This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 10/19/2019 at 07:51:10 (UTC).

ANDERSEN, GORDON vs. 3M COMPANY

Case Summary

On 09/25/2019 ANDERSEN, GORDON filed an Other lawsuit against 3M COMPANY. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is KYLE CARTER. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0165

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

KYLE CARTER

 

Party Details

Defendants

WOLVERINE BRASS INC

SQUARE D COMPANY

R V CLOUD COMPANY

GRINNELL LLC

GRUNDFOS CBS INC (INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO

CALIFORNIA DRYWALL COMPANY

3M COMPANY

O'REILLY AUTO ENTERPRISES LLC (F/K/A CSK AUTO INC)

WESTERN AUTO SUPPLY COMPANY

MUELLERICO LLC (INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO MUELLER

A H VOSS COMPANY

GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY

HILL BROTHERS CHEMICAL COMPANY

FAMILIA CORPORATION

JOHNSON CONTROLS INC (INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO THE

GRAYBAR ELECTRIC COMPANY INC

RHEEM MANUFACTURING COMPANY (INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST

VIACOM INC (SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO CBS CORPORATION A PENNSYLVANIA

SUPCO CORPORATION

CONSOLIDATED INSULATION INC

92 More Parties Available

 

Court Documents

LETTER ROGATORY ISSUED

09/25/2019: LETTER ROGATORY ISSUED

Civil Process Pick-Up Form

09/26/2019: Civil Process Pick-Up Form

Exhibit C

09/25/2019: Exhibit C

Exhibit B

09/25/2019: Exhibit B

Exhibit A

09/25/2019: Exhibit A

2017-11-17 Complaint for Personal Injuries

09/25/2019: 2017-11-17 Complaint for Personal Injuries

Subpoena for Witness Deposition

09/25/2019: Subpoena for Witness Deposition

Order Re: Commisstion to Deose Third Party Witness

09/25/2019: Order Re: Commisstion to Deose Third Party Witness

Letter of Statement of Assurance

09/25/2019: Letter of Statement of Assurance

Def Mueller Steam Specialty's Notice of the Deposi

09/25/2019: Def Mueller Steam Specialty's Notice of the Deposi

Commission to take deposition outside california

09/25/2019: Commission to take deposition outside california

Original Complaint

09/25/2019: Original Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/25/2019
  • Description: LETTER ROGATORY ISSUED; Order Signed: 9/25/2019;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • Description: NO COSTS ALLOCATED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • Description: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person Filing: ANDERSEN, GORDON;

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JOHNSON CONTROLS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Grundfos is a litigant

Latest cases where CALIFORNIA DRYWALL CO., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where O'REILLY AUTO ENTERPRISES LLC (IS A FOREIGN LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY) is a litigant