Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 06/26/2020 at 07:34:26 (UTC).

ANAYA, JAVIER vs. SCHLUMBERGER TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 06/02/2020 ANAYA, JAVIER filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against SCHLUMBERGER TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is LAUREN REEDER. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****3139

  • Filing Date:

    06/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

LAUREN REEDER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

RIVERA, ALONDRA

ANAYA, JAVIER

Defendant

SCHLUMBERGER TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION

Other

SCHLUMBERGER TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION (A TEXAS-BASED FOR-PROFIT

206 E 9Th St Suite 1300

Austin, TX 78701

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

COLLINS, ROBERT L.

Po Box 7726

Houston, TX 77270

Defendant Attorney

NYE, JAMES HUNTER

 

Court Documents

Certified Mail Receipt

06/03/2020: Certified Mail Receipt

Domestic Return Receipt

06/10/2020: Domestic Return Receipt

Request for Issuance of Service

06/02/2020: Request for Issuance of Service

PLAINTIFFS' ORIGINAL PETITION REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE AND REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

06/02/2020: PLAINTIFFS' ORIGINAL PETITION REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE AND REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

Certified Mail Tracking # 7018 1830 0001 4427 1722

06/03/2020: Certified Mail Tracking # 7018 1830 0001 4427 1722

REMOVED TO FEDERAL COURT

06/03/2020: REMOVED TO FEDERAL COURT

Exhibit 1

06/03/2020: Exhibit 1

Notice of Filing Notice of Removal

06/03/2020: Notice of Filing Notice of Removal

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/03/2020
  • DocketDescription: REMOVED TO FEDERAL COURT;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (CERTIFIED); Status: SERVICE RETURNED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: SCHLUMBERGER TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION (A TEXAS-BASED FOR-PROFIT; Issued: 6/3/2020; Served: 6/9/2020; Tracking: 73754826; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: COLLINS, ROBERT L.; Person Filing: RIVERA, ALONDRA;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: COLLINS, ROBERT L.; Person Filing: ANAYA, JAVIER;

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Schlumberger Technology Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer NYE, JAMES HUNTER