This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 06/24/2015 at 12:07:45 (UTC).

AMWEST SURETY INSURANCE CO vs. BANNER, NINA

Case Summary

On 08/30/2004 AMWEST SURETY INSURANCE CO filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against BANNER, NINA. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****7547

  • Filing Date:

    08/30/2004

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Defendants

AMWEST SURETY INSURANCE CO

BANNER, NINA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

RABON, BARRY STEPHEN

BRADIE, PETER R.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/08/2005
  • NO COSTS ALLOCATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2005
  • ORDER OF NON-SUIT SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2005
  • ORDER SIGNED STRIKING PLEADING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2005
  • FIRST AMENDED ANSWER FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITI : Filing Attorney - BRADIE, PETER R. Person Filing - BANNER, NINA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2005
  • DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2005
  • DESIGNATED TRIAL READY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2004
  • ORDER SIGNED DENYING SPECIAL EXCEPTIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2004
  • FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - RABON, BARRY STEPHEN Person Filing - AMWEST SURETY INSURANCE CO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2004
  • ANSWER : Filing Attorney - RABON, BARRY STEPHEN Person Filing - AMWEST SURETY INSURANCE CO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2004
  • COUNTER CLAIM : Filing Attorney - BRADIE, PETER R. Person Filing - BANNER, NINA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2004
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - BRADIE, PETER R. Person Filing - BANNER, NINA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2004
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - RABON, BARRY STEPHEN Person Filing - AMWEST SURETY INSURANCE CO

    Read MoreRead Less