Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 11/05/2020 at 08:36:35 (UTC).

AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK vs. ARMENTA, EMILY

Case Summary

On 10/12/2020 AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ARMENTA, EMILY. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is ROBERT K. SCHAFFER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****5059

  • Filing Date:

    10/12/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

ROBERT K. SCHAFFER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK

Defendant

ARMENTA, EMILY

Houston, TX 77098

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROGERS, DAWN DESHEA

Defendant Attorney

SIMMONS, RICHARD ALLEN

 

Court Documents

Citation

10/19/2020: Citation

Defendant's Original Answer

10/22/2020: Defendant's Original Answer

Service Request

10/12/2020: Service Request

Plaintiffs Original Petition

10/12/2020: Plaintiffs Original Petition

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: SIMMONS, RICHARD ALLEN; Person Filing: ARMENTA, EMILY;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: ARMENTA, EMILY; Issued: 10/13/2020; Served: 10/16/2020; Tracking: 73800022; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: ROGERS, DAWN DESHEA; Person Filing: AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK;

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Simmons, Richard A