This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 03/30/2021 at 04:15:59 (UTC).

AMER, MOHAMMED MUSTAFA vs. AMER, PEGGY MAE GUTIERREZ

Case Summary

On 03/25/2021 AMER, MOHAMMED MUSTAFA filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against AMER, PEGGY MAE GUTIERREZ. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is SONYA L. HEATH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****7484

  • Filing Date:

    03/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

SONYA L. HEATH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMER, MOHAMMED MUSTAFA

Defendant

AMER, PEGGY MAE GUTIERREZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROEBUCK, JEFFREY T

2372 Calder Ave

Beaumont, TX 77702

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketDescription: WAIVER CITATION; Person Filing: AMER, PEGGY MAE GUTIERREZ;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketDescription: TRANSFERRED TO ANOTHER HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT COURT;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO ANOTHER DISTRICT COURT SIGNED; Order Signed: 3/26/2021;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketDescription: TRANSFERRED TO HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT COURT;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: ROEBUCK, JEFFREY T; Person Filing: AMER, MOHAMMED MUSTAFA;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROEBUCK, JEFFREY THOMAS