This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 06/18/2015 at 23:12:52 (UTC).

ALVEREZ, ELIDIA (IND AND ANF OF SABASTIA vs. PEREZ, MARCOS

Case Summary

On 12/02/2004 ALVEREZ, ELIDIA IND AND ANF OF SABASTIA filed an Other lawsuit against PEREZ, MARCOS. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****8491

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2004

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ALVEREZ, ELIDIA (IND AND ANF OF SABASTIAN ALAVERZ)

ALAVERZ, SABASTIAN

Defendant

PEREZ, MARCOS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STERN, JEFFREY M

Defendant Attorney

ROBERTS, MARK EDWARD

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/06/2005
  • ORDER OF NON-SUIT SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2005
  • EACH PAY OWN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2005
  • ORDER SIGNED RESETTING TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2005
  • ORDER SIGNED GRANTING TRIAL CONTINUANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2005
  • ORDER SIGNED GRANTING REFERRAL TO MEDIATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - ROBERTS, MARK EDWARD Person Filing - PEREZ, MARCOS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2005
  • DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2005
  • DESIGNATED TRIAL READY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2004
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2004
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - STERN, JEFFREY M Person Filing - ALAVERZ, SABASTIAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2004
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - STERN, JEFFREY M Person Filing - ALVEREZ, ELIDIA (IND AND ANF OF SABASTIAN ALAVERZ)

    Read MoreRead Less