Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 05/24/2021 at 21:02:23 (UTC).

ALVARADO-LOPEZ, JUANA vs. CATERPILLAR INC

Case Summary

On 04/28/2021 ALVARADO-LOPEZ, JUANA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CATERPILLAR INC. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is RAVI K. SANDILL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****5286

  • Filing Date:

    04/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

RAVI K. SANDILL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALVARADO-LOPEZ, JUANA

Defendants

CATERPILLAR INC

HOBBS, BENJAMIN D

Others

CATERPILLAR INC (A DELAWARE CORPORATION) MAY BE SERVED BY

211 E 7Th Street Suite 620

Austin, TX 78701

HOBBS, BENJAMIN D MAY BE SERVED BY SERVING THE CHAIR OF THE TEXAS

12323 N State Route 91

Dunlap, IL 61525

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KIESCHNICK, JONATHAN CHRISTOPHER

Defendant Attorney

HOWELL, BRADLEY KENT

 

Court Documents

Affidavit of Service (BENJAMIN D HOBBS)

05/04/2021: Affidavit of Service (BENJAMIN D HOBBS)

Affidavit of Service (CATERPILLAR INC)

05/04/2021: Affidavit of Service (CATERPILLAR INC)

Defendants' Original Answer

05/21/2021: Defendants' Original Answer

Civil Process Request

04/28/2021: Civil Process Request

Plaintiffs Original Petition

04/28/2021: Plaintiffs Original Petition

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: HOWELL, BRADLEY KENT; Person Filing: CATERPILLAR INC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: HOWELL, BRADLEY KENT; Person Filing: HOBBS, BENJAMIN D;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (STATE HIGHWAY COMMISSION); Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HOBBS, BENJAMIN D MAY BE SERVED BY SERVING THE CHAIR OF THE TEXAS; Issued: 4/28/2021; Served: 4/29/2021; Tracking: 73865547; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION CORPORATE; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: CATERPILLAR INC (A DELAWARE CORPORATION) MAY BE SERVED BY; Issued: 4/28/2021; Served: 4/29/2021; Tracking: 73865545; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: KIESCHNICK, JONATHAN CHRISTOPHER; Person Filing: ALVARADO-LOPEZ, JUANA;

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Caterpillar, Inc. is a litigant