This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 10/23/2020 at 07:26:08 (UTC).

ALVARADO, CHRISTIAN R. vs. HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT CLERK'S OFFICE

Case Summary

On 09/29/2020 ALVARADO, CHRISTIAN R filed an Other - Expungement lawsuit against HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT CLERK'S OFFICE. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is CHRISTINE WEEMS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1117

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Expungement

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

CHRISTINE WEEMS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALVARADO, CHRISTIAN R.

Defendants

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE

TDCJ-CJAD

2009 W. 14Th St. Suite 400,

Austin, TX 78701

HARRIS COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT

INSTANT CHECKMATE INC

3111 Camino Del Rio N, San

Diego, CA 92108

HARRIS COUNTY PRETRIAL SERVICES

TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY

STNV LLC

187 E. Warm Spring Rd. Ste B242, Las

Vegas, NV 89119

HARRIS COUNTY COMMUNITY SUPERVISION AND CORRECTIONS DEPARTMENT

HOUSTON POLICE DEPARTMENT

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT CLERK'S OFFICE

Others

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE BY SERVING BRIAN L. ROSE

1310 Prairie 5Th Floor

Houston, TX 77002

HARRIS COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT BY SERVING MAJOR MAC MCKELVY

1200 Baker Street

Houston, TX 77011

HOUSTON POLICE DEPARTMENT BY SERVING DEIDRE HARRIS

1200 Travis 16Th Floor

Houston, TX 77002

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT CLERK'S OFFICE BY SERVING RANDALL SMIDT

1310 Prairie Ste 880

Houston, TX 77002

TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY BY SERVING EXPUNCTION UNIT

Po Box 4143

Austin, TX 78765

HARRIS COUNTY PRETRIAL SERVICES BY SERVING KELVIN L BANKS DIRECTOR

102 San Jacinto

Houston, TX 77002

COMMUNITY SUPERVISION & CORRECTIONS BY SERVING DR TERESA MAY PHD

49 San Jacinto

Houston, TX 77002

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NGUYEN, HENRY KHOA

1221 Studewood

Houston, TX 77008

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/04/2020
  • HearingCourt: 281; Docket Type: Law Day Docket; Reason: EXPUNCTION; Requesting Party: NGUYEN, HENRY KHOA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: INSTANT CHECKMATE INC; Issued: 10/9/2020; Tracking: 73798947; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: STNV LLC; Issued: 10/9/2020; Served: 10/17/2020; Tracking: 73798946; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: TDCJ-CJAD; Issued: 10/9/2020; Tracking: 73798944; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: COMMUNITY SUPERVISION & CORRECTIONS BY SERVING DR TERESA MAY PHD; Issued: 10/9/2020; Tracking: 73794842; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY PRETRIAL SERVICES BY SERVING KELVIN L BANKS DIRECTOR; Issued: 10/9/2020; Tracking: 73794841; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY BY SERVING EXPUNCTION UNIT; Issued: 10/9/2020; Tracking: 73794840; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HOUSTON POLICE DEPARTMENT BY SERVING DEIDRE HARRIS; Issued: 10/9/2020; Tracking: 73794839; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT BY SERVING MAJOR MAC MCKELVY; Issued: 10/9/2020; Tracking: 73794838; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE BY SERVING BRIAN L. ROSE; Issued: 10/9/2020; Tracking: 73794837; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT CLERK'S OFFICE BY SERVING RANDALL SMIDT; Issued: 10/9/2020; Tracking: 73794836; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORDER SIGNED SETTING HEARING; Order Signed: 10/6/2020;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: NGUYEN, HENRY KHOA; Person Filing: ALVARADO, CHRISTIAN R.;

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TDCJ-CJAD is a litigant

Latest cases where INSTANT CHECK MATE LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where HARRIS COUNTY COMMUNITY SUPERVISION AND CORRECTIONS DEPARMENT is a litigant

Latest cases where COMMUNITY SUPERVISION AND CORRECTIONS BY SERVING DR TERESA MAY PHD is a litigant