Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 02/15/2021 at 07:38:42 (UTC).

ALTOBJI, SALAM vs. KROGER TEXAS L P

Case Summary

On 01/22/2021 ALTOBJI, SALAM filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against KROGER TEXAS L P. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is BEAU MILLER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****4106

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

BEAU MILLER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALTOBJI, SALAM

Defendants

KROGER TEXAS L P

THE KROGER CO

Others

THE KROGER CO MAY BE SERVED BY SERVING ITS REGISTERED AGENT

211 E 7Th Street Suite 620

Austin, TX 78701

KROGER TEXAS L P MAY BE SERVED BY SERVING ITS REGISTERED AGENT

211 E 7Th Street Suite 620

Austin, TX 78701

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GLAZE, JORDAN A

Defendant Attorney

AKERS, BROCK C.

 

Court Documents

Certified Mail Receipt

01/25/2021: Certified Mail Receipt

Certified Mail Receipt

01/25/2021: Certified Mail Receipt

Defendant's Original Answer

02/05/2021: Defendant's Original Answer

Jury Demand

02/05/2021: Jury Demand

PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE

01/22/2021: PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE

Certified Mail Tracking Number 7018 2290 0001 3523 9361

01/25/2021: Certified Mail Tracking Number 7018 2290 0001 3523 9361

Certified Mail Tracking Number 7018 2290 0001 3523 9354

01/25/2021: Certified Mail Tracking Number 7018 2290 0001 3523 9354

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketDescription: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: AKERS, BROCK C.; Person Filing: THE KROGER CO;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: AKERS, BROCK C.; Person Filing: KROGER TEXAS L P;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (CERTIFIED); Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: THE KROGER CO MAY BE SERVED BY SERVING ITS REGISTERED AGENT; Issued: 1/25/2021; Tracking: 73833781; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (CERTIFIED); Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: KROGER TEXAS L P MAY BE SERVED BY SERVING ITS REGISTERED AGENT; Issued: 1/25/2021; Tracking: 73833779; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: GLAZE, JORDAN ANDREW; Person Filing: ALTOBJI, SALAM;

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Kroger Texas LP is a litigant

Latest cases where The Kroger Co is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer AKERS, BROCK C.